EP2279938 - Motor driving device and electric vehicle equipped with the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | [2011/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sagara, Hiroaki c/o Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-Chome Moriguchi City Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 02 /
Taguchi, Kenji c/o Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-Chome Moriguchi City Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 03 /
Nagao, Takeshi c/o Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-Chome Moriguchi City Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 04 /
Uchino, Takashi c/o Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-Chome Moriguchi City Osaka 570-8677 / JP | [2011/05] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/05] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10007866.6 | 28.07.2010 | [2011/05] | Priority number, date | JP20090176877 | 29.07.2009 Original published format: JP 2009176877 | [2011/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2279938 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B62M7/12, B60K7/00 | [2011/05] | CPC: |
B62M7/12 (EP,US);
B62K11/10 (EP,US);
B60K7/0007 (EP,US);
B60L2200/12 (EP,US);
B62K2202/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Motorantriebsvorrichtung und mit dieser ausgerüstetes Elektrofahrzeug | [2011/05] | English: | Motor driving device and electric vehicle equipped with the same | [2011/05] | French: | Dispositif de commande de moteur et véhicule électrique équipé de celui-ci | [2011/05] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 20.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/10] | 09.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2008100609 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4-6 * paragraph [0054]; figure 9 *; | [XY]EP1270395 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraph [0056]; figure 6 * [Y] 4; | [Y]JP2003134610 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034]; figures 4,8 * |