Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
06.10.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
06.09.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.03.2015 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
03.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant | |
02.09.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.02.2014 | Publication of search report | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
28.02.2014 | Change - classification | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
28.02.2014 | Change - classification | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
04.09.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.09.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.02.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] |
11.02.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] |