EP2296304 - Base station, terminal and wireless communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeuchi, Keisuke Hitachi Ltd. 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1,Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Katayama, Rintaro Hitachi Ltd. 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1,Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Tomonori Hitachi Ltd. 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1,Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Uwano, Koki Hitachi Ltd. 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1,Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2011/11] | Application number, filing date | 10008190.0 | 05.08.2010 | [2011/11] | Priority number, date | JP20090211617 | 14.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009211617 | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2296304 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2296304 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L5/00 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
H04L1/1614 (EP,US);
H04L1/1671 (EP,US);
H04L1/1822 (EP,US);
H04L1/1854 (EP,US);
H04L1/1887 (EP,US);
H04L5/0055 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,US);
H04L1/0025 (EP,US);
H04L1/1819 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Basisstation, Endgerät und drahtloses Kommunikationssystem | [2011/11] | English: | Base station, terminal and wireless communication system | [2011/11] | French: | Station de base, terminal et système de communication sans fil | [2011/11] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 30.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/03] | 07.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2008054313 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 16 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] * [A] 1-15,17-21; | [A]WO2009088167 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 11 - page 12 *; | [A]WO2007092258 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0022] *; | [XA] - ERICSSON, "MIMO Related DL Control Signalling", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-080341, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080109), vol. RAN WG1, no. Sevilla, Spain; 20080109, XP050108860 [X] 16 * page 1 - page 4 * [A] 1-15,17-21 | [A] - ZHENG ET AL, "Multiple ARQ Processes for MIMO Systems", EURASIP JOURNAL OF APPLIED SIGNAL PROCESSING, HINDAWI PUBLISHING CO., CUYAHOGA FALLS, OH, US, (20040501), vol. 5, ISSN 1110-8657, XP002347853 [A] 1-21 * Section 3; page 774 - page 776 * | by applicant | JP2008211411 | - A. JALALI; R. PADOVANI; R. PANKAJ, "Data Throughput of CDMA-HDR High Efficiency-High Data Rate Personal Communication Wireless System", PROCEEDINGS OF VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE (VTC), vol. 3, pages 1854 - 1858 |