EP2415385 - Dishwasher [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2013 [2013/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lundberg, Mats Västmannagatan 47 ÖG 11325 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
Salerno, Luigi Via Aldo Moro 20092 Cinisello Balsamo (MI) / IT | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Samzelius, Roger Mikael AB Electrolux Group Intellectual Property 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Samzelius, Roger Mikael AB Electrolux Group Intellectual Property 105 45 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 10008218.9 | 06.08.2010 | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2415385 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/50 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
A47L15/50 (EP,US);
A47L15/501 (US);
A47L15/502 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Geschirrspüler | [2012/06] | English: | Dishwasher | [2012/06] | French: | Lave-vaisselle | [2012/06] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 09.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/06] | 14.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2919141 (RAPP HELMUT) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [XA]FR2501993 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 1, lines 29-33; page 2, lines 24-28; page 3, lines 3-26; figures * [A] 3-14; | [YA]EP0372342 (MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI SPA [IT]) [Y] 3-7 * column 1, lines 3-12; column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 29; claims, figures * [A] 1,2,8-14; | [YA]WO2009041899 (ASKO CYLINDA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 11-14 * page 1, line 26 - page 4, line 22; claims; figures * [A] 1-10; | [XY]EP2138085 (MEIKO MASCHINENBAU GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,8-10 * paragraphs [0029] - [0036]; figure -; claim - * [Y] 3-7,11-14 |