EP2284783 - Electronic wallet device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phytrex Technology Corporation 3F-2, No. 189, Sec. 2 Keelung Rd. Xinyi Dist T'ai pei / TW | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsiao, Feng-Chi 3-F, No. 189, Sec. 2 Keelung Road Xinyi District Taipei 110 / TW | 02 /
Yang, Kun-Shan 3-F, No. 189, Sec. 2 Keelung Road Xinyi District Taipei 110 / TW | 03 /
Lin, Tung-Fu 3-F, No. 189, Sec. 2 Keelung Road Xinyi District Taipei 110 / TW | 04 /
Cheng, Chin-Fen 3-F, No. 189, Sec. 2 Keelung Road Xinyi District Taipei 110 / TW | 05 /
Lee, Chih-Wei 3-F, No. 189, Sec. 2 Keelung Road Xinyi District Taipei 110 / TW | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Kennedydamm 55/Roßstr. 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2011/07] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10008235.3 | 06.08.2010 | [2011/07] | Priority number, date | CN200920170119U | 12.08.2009 Original published format: CN 200920170119 U | [2011/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2284783 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/00, G07F7/08 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
G06Q20/349 (EP,US);
G06Q20/28 (KR);
G06Q20/04 (KR);
G06Q20/322 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3226 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3229 (EP,US);
G06Q20/353 (EP,US);
G06Q20/36 (EP,US);
G06Q20/363 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektronische Geldbörsenvorrichtung | [2011/07] | English: | Electronic wallet device | [2011/07] | French: | Dispositif de porte-monnaie électronique | [2011/07] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/38] | 20.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 19.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2011 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03044710 (TRUSTCOPY PTE LTD [SG], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 13, line 25 - page 14, line 31 * * page 15, line 21 - page 17, line 26 * * page 19, line 27 - page 20, line 17 ** page 21, line 11 - page 22, line 7 *; | [A]US2007293155 (LIAO DAVE TA-WU [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] *; | [YA]US2008230601 (SUZUKI MIKIHISA [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3,7-10,12-15 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0137] * * paragraph [0299] - paragraph [0317] * * paragraph [0350] - paragraph [0354] * [A] 2,4-6,11; | [YA]US2008272187 (FUJIMOTO MASAO [JP]) [Y] 1,3,7-10,12-15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0063] * * figures 2-3; claims 1-16 * [A] 2,4-6,11; | [Y]KR20090007649 (BIZMODELINE CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1,7-10,12-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0126]; figures 1-2 *; | [YA]WO2009084608 (KYOCERA CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3,7-10,12-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0062]; figures 2-3 * [A] 4-6,11; | EP2226755 [ ] (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) | Examination | EP1688867 |