EP2418483 - Ultrasonic inspection apparatus and method for inspection of components and a wedge and method for producing a wedge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RWE Npower plc. Electron Windmill Hill Business Park Swindon SN5 6PB / GB | [2012/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charlesworth, Christopher Flat 1, Midhall, Carleton Road Pontefract WF8 3JR West Yorkshire / GB | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Richly & Ritschel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 100411 51404 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | Kierdorf Ritschel Sattlerweg 14 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2012/07] | Polypatent Postfach 10 04 11 51404 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 10008308.8 | 10.08.2010 | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2418483 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/24, G01N29/265, G01N29/28 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
G01N29/28 (EP);
G01N29/043 (EP);
G01N29/2487 (EP);
G01N2291/044 (EP);
G01N2291/102 (EP);
G01N2291/2693 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ultraschallprüfvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Prüfung von Komponenten und eines Keils sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Keils | [2012/07] | English: | Ultrasonic inspection apparatus and method for inspection of components and a wedge and method for producing a wedge | [2012/07] | French: | Appareil d'inspection ultrasonique et procédé d'inspection de composants et cale et procédé de production d'une cale | [2012/07] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 28.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009120192 (SUZUKI YUTAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * the whole document *; | [X]JPS61148366 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US5913243 (HOPECK JAMES F [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 14 - line 17; figure 2 * * claims 1,6 *; | [A]US6082198 (SABOURIN PAUL F [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006283250 (FAIR MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0047]; figure 3 *; | [A]JPH07248316 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [AD]US4502331 (SINGH GURVINDER P [US], et al) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document * | [XY] - Dr. Michael F. Opheys, Hans Rauschenbach,Michael Siegel, "Blade Root / Blade Attachment Inspection by Advanced UT and Phased Array Technique", NDT.net, vol. 9, no. 1, (20040101), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://www.ndt.net/article/v09n01/rauschen/rauschen.htm, (20110112), XP002616988 [X] 1,5 * the whole document * [Y] 2 | by applicant | US4502331 | EP1610122 |