EP2418911 - Method, public land mobile network, user equipment and program for controlling the establishment of a packet data connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2012/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nenner, Karl-Heinz Kolpingweg 9 53332 Bornheim / DE | 02 /
Jacobsohn, Dieter Holtorferstrasse 32 b 53229 Bonn / DE | 03 /
Schmitt, Harald Jacobystrasse 3a 56170 Bendorf / DE | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Schwöbel, Thilo K., et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Schwöbel, Thilo K., et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2012/07] | Schwöbel, Thilo K., et al Patentanwälte Kutzenberger & Wolff Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 10008467.2 | 13.08.2010 | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2418911 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2418911 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/02 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
H04W76/18 (EP,US);
H04W48/17 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren, öffentliches Landfunknetz, Teilnehmergerät und Programm zur Steuerung des Aufbaus einer Paketdatenverbindung | [2012/07] | English: | Method, public land mobile network, user equipment and program for controlling the establishment of a packet data connection | [2012/07] | French: | Procédé, réseau mobile terrestre public, équipement d'utilisateur et programme pour contrôler l'établissement d'une connexion de données en paquet | [2012/07] | Examination procedure | 15.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 11.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.05.2013 | BE | 29.05.2013 | CY | 29.05.2013 | DK | 29.05.2013 | EE | 29.05.2013 | FI | 29.05.2013 | LT | 29.05.2013 | LV | 29.05.2013 | MC | 29.05.2013 | MK | 29.05.2013 | MT | 29.05.2013 | SE | 29.05.2013 | SI | 29.05.2013 | SM | 29.05.2013 | IE | 13.08.2013 | LU | 13.08.2013 | BG | 29.08.2013 | NO | 29.08.2013 | IS | 29.09.2013 | PT | 30.09.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | BE | 29.05.2013 | |
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
MK | 29.05.2013 | ||
MT | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 13.08.2013 | ||
LU | 13.08.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | BE | 29.05.2013 | |
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
MK | 29.05.2013 | ||
MT | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 13.08.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | BE | 29.05.2013 | |
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 13.08.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | BE | 29.05.2013 | |
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 13.08.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | BE | 29.05.2013 | |
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 13.08.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | BE | 29.05.2013 | |
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | BE | 29.05.2013 | |
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | BE | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 29.05.2013 | |
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 29.05.2013 | |
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 29.05.2013 | |
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 29.05.2013 | |
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 29.05.2013 | |
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006183472 (NOOKALA SRIRAM N [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-12,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] * [I] 3,5,13; | [XI]WO2010016546 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-12,14 * the whole document * * figures 3, 4, 8 * [I] 3,5,13; | [I]GB2431069 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1,10,11,14 * abstract * * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 6 * * page 9, line 10 - page 11, line 16 * * claims 1, 2 *; | [A]EP1655901 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030] *; | [A]WO2008011918 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M, et al) [A] 3 * abstract * * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 13 * * page 13, line 13 - page 14, line 10 * |