EP2293637 - Method and apparatus for performing buffer status reporting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovative Sonic Corporation 14F, No. 30 Beiping E. Rd. Zhongzheng Dist. Taipei City 10049 / TW | [2013/31] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states Innovative Sonic Corporation 3F, No.58 Jhouzih St. Neihu District Taipei City / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tseng, Li-Chih 4F, No. 150, Li-Te Road Peitou Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Ou, Meng-Hui 4F, No. 150, Li-Te Road Peitou Taipei City / TW | 03 /
Guo, Yu-Hsuan 4F, No. 150, Li-Te Road Peitou Taipei City / TW | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Görz, Ingo, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | Görz, Ingo, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10008483.9 | 13.08.2010 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | US20090239069P | 02.09.2009 Original published format: US 239069 P | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2293637 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2293637 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
H04W72/1221 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/0278 (KR);
H04W24/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung von Berichterstattung des Zwischenspeicherzustands | [2011/10] | English: | Method and apparatus for performing buffer status reporting | [2011/10] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour réaliser des rapports d'état du tampon | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2010 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 06.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.07.2014
31.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.07.2014
31.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | 29.08.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.03.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2010 | AL | 23.10.2013 | AT | 23.10.2013 | BE | 23.10.2013 | BG | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | CZ | 23.10.2013 | DK | 23.10.2013 | EE | 23.10.2013 | ES | 23.10.2013 | FI | 23.10.2013 | HR | 23.10.2013 | IT | 23.10.2013 | LT | 23.10.2013 | LV | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | MT | 23.10.2013 | NL | 23.10.2013 | PL | 23.10.2013 | RO | 23.10.2013 | SE | 23.10.2013 | SI | 23.10.2013 | SK | 23.10.2013 | TR | 23.10.2013 | NO | 23.01.2014 | GR | 24.01.2014 | IS | 23.02.2014 | PT | 24.02.2014 | IE | 13.08.2014 | LU | 13.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | [2022/27] |
Former [2019/38] | AL | 23.10.2013 | |
AT | 23.10.2013 | ||
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 13.08.2014 | ||
LU | 13.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 23.10.2013 | |
AT | 23.10.2013 | ||
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 13.08.2014 | ||
LU | 13.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 13.08.2014 | ||
LU | 13.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 13.08.2014 | ||
LU | 13.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 13.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 23.10.2013 | |
NO | 23.01.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (Release 8)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.321, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090601), no. V8.6.0, pages 1 - 44, XP050377622 [AD] 1-11 * Sections 5.4.4 and 5.4.5 * | [XP] - ASUSTEK, "Clarification on BSR trigger", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-095622 CLARIFICATION ON BSR TRIGGER (DISCUSSION), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091012), no. Miyazaki; 20091012, XP050390139 [XP] 1-11 * the whole document * | [XP] - ASUSTEK, "Clarification on BSR trigger", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-095624 CLARIFICATION ON BSR TRIGGER (CR), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091012), no. Miyazaki; 20091012, XP050390141 [XP] 1-11 * the whole document * |