EP2259373 - Solid oxide fuel cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technical University of Denmark Anker Engelundsvej 1 Bygning 101A 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larsen, Peter Halvor Dalsvinget 13 6400 Soenderborg / DK | 02 /
Mogensen, Mogens Krogenlundvej 10 3540 Lynge / DK | 03 /
Linderoth, Søren Egevej 47 4000 Roskilde / DK | 04 /
Hansen, Kent Kammer Skelbækvej 83 1 3650 Ølstykke / DK | 05 /
Wang, Wei Guo Ningbo Institue of Materials Technology & Engineering Chinese Academy of Science Ningbo Zhejiang 315211 / CN | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10008761.8 | 09.06.2005 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | DK20040000904 | 10.06.2004 Original published format: DK 200400904 | DK20050000159 | 02.02.2005 Original published format: DK 200500159 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2259373 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/12, H01M4/86, H01M4/88, H01M4/90, H01M8/02 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
H01M8/0223 (EP,US);
H01M8/02 (KR);
H01M4/8621 (EP,US);
H01M4/8885 (EP,US);
H01M4/9016 (EP,US);
H01M4/9025 (EP,US);
H01M4/9066 (EP,US);
H01M8/021 (EP,US);
H01M8/0232 (EP,US);
H01M8/0236 (EP,US);
H01M8/0243 (EP,US);
H01M8/0247 (EP,US);
H01M8/12 (KR);
H01M8/1226 (EP,US);
H01M8/126 (EP,US);
H01M4/9033 (EP,US);
H01M8/0217 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | Festoxidbrennstoffzelle | [2010/49] | English: | Solid oxide fuel cell | [2010/49] | French: | Pile à combustible d'oxyde solide | [2010/49] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 27.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/25] | 04.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05748533.6 / EP1784888 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050748533) is 26.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5064734 (NAZMY MOHAMED [CH]) [X] 1-4,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 43 - line 63 * * column 3, line 54 - line 58 * * column 5, line 20 - line 31 * * column 10, line 5 - line 6 *; | [XY]DE4237602 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-9 * abstract * * column 2, line 22 - line 50 * * column 3, line 1 - line 44 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 65 * * column 7, line 30 - line 33 * [Y] 5,6,10-21; | [Y]US6017647 (WALLIN STEN A [US]) [Y] 16-18 * abstract * * column 2, line 21 - line 32 * * column 4, line 1 - line 60 * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 10 *; | [Y]US6232009 (BATAWI EMAD [CH]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * column 2, line 23 - line 56 * * column 3; claims 1,3,7 *; | [A]US6280868 (BADWAL SUKHVINDER P S [AU], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 2, line 69 - column 3, line 62 * * column 4, line 12 - line 24; claim 5 *; | [Y]US2001029231 (GORTE RAYMOND J [US], et al) [Y] 10-14,16-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] , [0021] *; | [AD]US2002048699 (STEELE BRIAN CHARLES HILTON [GB], et al) [AD] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0065] - [0068] - [0075]; claim 24 *; | [A]US2002122967 (GORINA LILIYA FEDOROVNA [RU], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0216]; claim 23 *; | [A]US2003231973 (KRUMPELT MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0012] - [0019] , [0022] , [0032] , [0036] , [0040] , [0042] , [0051] - [0054]; tables 1,2 *; | [A]EP1383195 (TOHO GAS KK [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract ** paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0065] , [0105] *; | [A]CA2440288 (ALBERTA RES COUNCIL [CA]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 16 *; | [A] - KIM J-H ET AL, "Fabrication and characteristics of anode-supported flat-tube solid oxide fuel cell", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030723), vol. 122, no. 2, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 138 - 143, XP004437055 [A] 1-21 * abstract * * page 140, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 141, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 142, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-7753(03)00431-2 | [A] - CHANGRONG XIA ET AL, "Functionally graded cathodes for honeycomb solid oxide fuel cells", ELECTROCHEMICAL AND SOLID-STATE LETTERS ELECTROCHEM. SOC USA, (2002), vol. 5, no. 10, ISSN 1099-0062, pages A217 - A220, XP002359277 [A] 1-21 * page 1, column 2, paragraph 1; table 1 * | [YA] - YOUNG R.C. ET AL, "SYMPOSIUM BB: Materials and Technologies for a Hydrogen Economy", MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS SERIES, (20031130), pages 709 - 717, URL: http://lucy.mrs.org/meetings/fall2003/program/AbstractBookBB.pdf, XP002359244 [Y] 6,15 * "Synthesis and Characterization of Gd(1-x)Sr(x)Co(1-y)Fe(y)O(3- *delta* ) as a Cathode Material for Intermediate Temperature Solid Oxide Fuel Cells." - Chris Dyck et al.; page 712, column 2, paragraph BB3.4 * [A] 21 | [ ] - DYCK C.R. ET AL, "Synthesis and Characterization of Gd(1-x)SrxCo(1-y)FeyO(3-?) as a Cathode Material for Intermediate Temperature Solid Oxide Fuel Cells", MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS, MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY, PITTSBURG, PA, US, vol. 801, ISSN 0272-9172, (2004), pages BB3.4.1 - BB3.4.6, URL: http://lucy.mrs.org/cgi-bin/check_membership_access/proceedings/fall2003/bb/BB3_4.pdf, XP008057502 | by applicant | US2002048699 |