EP2293396 - System for supplying individual workplaces with energy and data through add-on modules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tehalit GmbH Seebergstrasse 37 67716 Heltersberg / DE | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schnurr, Richard Rehbergstrasse 12 66957 Vinningen / DE | 02 /
Schmitt, Erwin Turmstrasse 3a 67659 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | Nuss, Laurent, et al Laurent Nuss Conseil 12, rue Theophile Schuler 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Nuss, Laurent, et al Cabinet Nuss 10, rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2011/10] | Patentanwälte Bitterich, Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger Westring 17 76829 Landau / DE | Application number, filing date | 10009030.7 | 31.08.2010 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | DE20092012168U | 08.09.2009 Original published format: DE 202009012168 U | [2011/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2293396 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2293396 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/00, H02G3/16, A47B21/06 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
H02G3/00 (EP);
A47B21/06 (EP);
H02G3/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/10] | H02G3/00, H02G3/16, A47B21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System zur Versorgung von einzelnen Arbeitsplätzen mit Energie und Daten über Zusatzmodule | [2011/10] | English: | System for supplying individual workplaces with energy and data through add-on modules | [2011/10] | French: | Système d'alimentation en énergie et en données de postes de travail individuels à l'aide de modules supplémentaires | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 19.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/12] | 10.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5575668 (TIMMERMAN PAUL [US]) [I] 1-9 * figures 1,2 *; | [XDI]DE20013313U (STUTTGARTER MESSE UND KONGRESS [DE]) [XD] 1 * figures 1,6-8 * [I] 2-9; | [XDI]DE10034532 (PFALZMOEBEL GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1 * figures 1,2 * [I] 2-9; | [XI]EP1511129 (TEHALIT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * [I] 2-9; | [XI]EP1050938 (POELLET WILFRIED [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1,3,4 * [I] 2-9; | [A]DE7602708U (HERMANN ABKE) [A] 1-9 * figures 1,2,5 * | by applicant | DE202006016371U | DE20013313U | DE10034532 |