EP2249380 - Method for cutting semiconductor substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho, Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuyo, Fumitsugu c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 02 /
Fukumitsu, Kenshi c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 03 /
Uchiyama, Naoki c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 04 /
Sugiura, Ryuji c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2012/49] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
Fukuyo, Fumitsugu /o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | ||
02 /
Fukumitsu, Kenshi /o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | |||
03 /
Uchiyama, Naoki /o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | |||
04 /
Sugiura, Ryuji /o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10009049.7 | 11.09.2003 | [2010/45] | Priority number, date | JP20020351600 | 03.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002351600 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2249380 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2249380 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2249380 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/301, B28D5/00, B23K26/40, B23K101/40, B23K26/08 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
B23K26/0853 (EP,US);
H01L21/302 (KR);
H01L21/2633 (US);
B23K26/40 (EP,US);
B23K26/53 (EP,US);
B28D1/221 (EP,US);
H01L21/6835 (EP,US);
H01L21/6836 (EP,US);
H01L21/78 (EP,US);
H01L24/27 (EP,US);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
B23K2101/40 (EP,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68327 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68336 (EP,US);
H01L2224/274 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2919 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83191 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8385 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01023 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01027 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0103 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01039 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0106 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01075 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/07802 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10329 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12043 (EP,US);
H01L2924/351 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/2919, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12043, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3512, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/45] |
Former [2011/28] | |||
Former [2010/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Schneiden eines Halbleitersubstrats | [2010/45] | English: | Method for cutting semiconductor substrate | [2010/45] | French: | Méthode de découpe de substrat semi-conducteur | [2010/45] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03812274.3 / EP1580800 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030812274) is 08.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 19.06.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 19.06.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.09.2003 | AT | 06.11.2013 | BG | 06.11.2013 | CY | 06.11.2013 | CZ | 06.11.2013 | DK | 06.11.2013 | EE | 06.11.2013 | FI | 06.11.2013 | MC | 06.11.2013 | RO | 06.11.2013 | SE | 06.11.2013 | SI | 06.11.2013 | SK | 06.11.2013 | TR | 06.11.2013 | GR | 07.02.2014 | PT | 06.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.09.2003 | |
AT | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
SE | 06.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0222301 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [YP]EP1338371 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [YP] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2002226796 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2002158276 | JP2000104040 | - "Silicon Processing Characteristic Evaluation by Picosecond Pulse Laser", PREPRINTS OF THE NATIONAL MEETINGS OF JAPAN WELDING SOCIETY, (200004), vol. 66, pages 72 - 73 |