EP2298657 - Food container, food container assembly, handle and tray [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amcor Flexibles Kreuzlingen Ltd. Finkernstrasse 34 8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bogdanis, Lori 4650 St. Ignatius Montreal, QC H4B 2B7 / CA | 02 /
Charette, Julie 2100 Joliette Montreal, QC H1W 3G6 / CA | 03 /
Gudgeon, Tracey 442 runnymede Dollard des Ormeaux, QC H9G 1K9 / CA | 04 /
Monatte, Carine 4287 Langevin Montreal, QC H4C 1G2 / CA | 05 /
Paré, Diane 57 De la Valline Notre-Dame-Ile-Perrot, QC J7V 9S5 / CA | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Burkhart, Hans 3A Technology & Management Ltd. Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 CH-8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | Burkhart, Hans 3A Technology & Management Ltd. Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | Application number, filing date | 10009172.7 | 03.09.2010 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | DE20091042021 | 21.09.2009 Original published format: DE102009042021 | DE20091056326 | 01.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009056326 | [2011/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2298657 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/42, B65D5/46, B65D1/26, B65D71/40 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
B65D5/42 (EP);
B65D1/26 (EP);
B65D5/46024 (EP);
B65D71/40 (EP);
B65D2571/00493 (EP);
B65D2571/00512 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Lebensmittelverpackungsbehälter, Lebensmittelverpackungsbehälter-Lebensmittelprodukt-Einheit, Träger sowie Aufsteller | [2011/12] | English: | Food container, food container assembly, handle and tray | [2011/12] | French: | Contenant d'emballage alimentaire, ensemble de contenants, poignée et plateau | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/12] | 03.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2117502 (SAMUEL REICH) [Y] 14,15 * page 2, line 39 - line 45; figures 6,7 *; | [X]BE673877 (CARTONNERIES DE SAINT-GERMAIN) [X] 12-14 * page 1, paragraph 2 *; | [XY]DE8010485U (LANDGOLD MILCH GMBH [DE]) [X] 12,13 * page 5, paragraph 4; figures 1-3 * [Y] 14,15; | [Y]US5287990 (KNOX JERRY L [US]) [Y] 7,8 * column 4, lines 3,24-26; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4239742 (EGGERS ERIKA [DE]) [A] 1* column 1, line 3 - line 9 *; | [A]US5551566 (SUTHERLAND ROBERT L [US]) [A] 14 * column 4, line 40; figures 2,3 *; | [XYI]DE202007006391U (MAIWALD HERRMANN DAGMAR G [DE]) [X] 1-6,9,10 * paragraph [0004]; claim 5 * [Y] 7,8 [I] 11; | [X]US2008087556 (HENKE DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 16 * figure 1 * |