EP2315219 - Transformer device for gate drive and gate drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marantec Antriebs- und Steuerungstechnik GmbH & Co. KG Remser Brook 11 33428 Marienfeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Marantec Antriebs- und Steuerungstechnik GmbH & Co. KG. Remser Brook 11 33428 Marienfeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hörmann, Michael Bokeler Strasse 22 33790 Halle/Westf. / DE | [2011/17] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10009294.9 | 07.09.2010 | [2011/17] | Priority number, date | DE20092014334U | 23.10.2009 Original published format: DE 202009014334 U | [2011/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2315219 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2315219 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/02, H01F27/06 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
H01F27/02 (EP);
H01F27/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Trafovorrichtung für Torantrieb und Torantrieb | [2011/17] | English: | Transformer device for gate drive and gate drive | [2011/17] | French: | Dispositif de transformateur pour entraînement de portail et entraînement de portail | [2011/17] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/48] | 13.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1541793 (MARANTEC ANTRIEB STEUERUNG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] - [0007] - [0 13] - [0016]; figures 1-4,6,7, *; | [XAI]DE102005001314 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0024] - [0026] , [0027]; figures 1-3 * [A] 3 [I] 9; | [A]EP1452681 (MARANTEC ANTRIEB STEUERUNG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0017]; figure 2 *; | [A]EP1760240 (MARANTEC ANTRIEB STEUERUNG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0016]; figures 1,3 * |