EP2302001 - Xanthene-based colorant compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Kaoru Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Murai, Yasuaki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Inoue, Kei Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Hirose, Masashi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Miyazaki, Takeshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Nagao, Ryosuke Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Mori, Otome Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Kawabe, Minako Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/49] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
Takahashi, Kaoru Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Murai, Yasuaki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Inoue, Kei Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Hirose, Masashi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
05 /
Miyazaki, Takeshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
06 /
Nagao, Ryosuke Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
07 /
Mori, Otome Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
08 /
Kawabe, Minako Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Weser, Thilo Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Weser, Thilo Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/13] | Weser, Thilo Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10009436.6 | 09.09.2010 | [2011/13] | Priority number, date | JP20090217326 | 18.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009217326 | JP20090290110 | 22.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009290110 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2302001 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2302001 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C09B11/20, C09D11/00 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
C09B11/20 (EP,US);
C09B11/24 (EP,US);
C09D11/328 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | Xanthen Farbstoffverbindung | [2011/13] | English: | Xanthene-based colorant compound | [2011/13] | French: | Composé de colorants xanthène | [2011/13] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/45] | 05.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.09.2010 | AL | 05.12.2012 | AT | 05.12.2012 | BE | 05.12.2012 | CY | 05.12.2012 | CZ | 05.12.2012 | DK | 05.12.2012 | EE | 05.12.2012 | FI | 05.12.2012 | LT | 05.12.2012 | LV | 05.12.2012 | MC | 05.12.2012 | MK | 05.12.2012 | MT | 05.12.2012 | NL | 05.12.2012 | PL | 05.12.2012 | RO | 05.12.2012 | SE | 05.12.2012 | SI | 05.12.2012 | SK | 05.12.2012 | SM | 05.12.2012 | TR | 05.12.2012 | BG | 05.03.2013 | NO | 05.03.2013 | GR | 06.03.2013 | ES | 16.03.2013 | IS | 05.04.2013 | PT | 05.04.2013 | HR | 31.07.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 09.09.2010 | |
AT | 05.12.2012 | ||
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
MK | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
MK | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 05.12.2012 | |
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 05.12.2012 | |
NO | 05.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005277042 (TOYODA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * example s *; | [AD]JPH09241553 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [AD] 1-11 * compounds I-12, II-9 *; | [A]JPH09157562 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [A] 1-11 * compounds D-20, D-27 *; | [A]DE2460491 (HOECHST AG) [A] 1 * example 76 * | by applicant | JPH09241553 | JP2008094897 | JPH0873791 | JP2006143989 | WO2004104108 | JP2003192930 |