EP2302117 - Transport bag and method for producing a transport bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/13] | Transport bag and method for producing a reinforced textile edge | ||
[2019/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Greif Flexibles Trading Holding B.V. Schipolweg 101N 2316 XC Leiden / NL | [2018/16] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Storsack Holding GmbH Industriestrasse 28A 68519 Viernheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Samadijavan, Amir, Dr. Friedrich Engels Platz 15-16/2/32 1200 Wien / AT | 02 /
Schmitt, Karl Scheibmühlersiedlung 16 3160 Traisen / AT | 03 /
Tauber, Arpad Kindergartenweg 9 5071 Wals / AT | 04 /
Luca, Maria Ort Tur Nr. 334 Negresti-Oas Satu-Mare / RO | [2011/13] | Representative(s) | Puchberger & Partner Patentanwälte Reichsratsstraße 13 1010 Wien / AT | [2019/36] |
Former [2011/13] | Puchberger, Peter, et al Puchberger, Berger & Partner Reichsratsstrasse 13 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 10009600.7 | 15.09.2010 | [2011/13] | Priority number, date | AT20090001484 | 21.09.2009 Original published format: AT 14842009 | [2011/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2302117 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2302117 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2302117 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | D03D1/04, D03D5/00, B65D88/16, D03D15/00 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
D03D1/04 (EP,US);
B65D88/1612 (EP,US);
D03D15/43 (EP,US);
D03D5/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1362 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/13] | D03D1/04, D03D5/00, B65D88/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] |
Former [2011/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Transportsack und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Transportsacks | [2019/21] | English: | Transport bag and method for producing a transport bag | [2019/17] | French: | Sac de transport et procédé de fabrication d'un sac de transport | [2019/17] |
Former [2011/13] | Transportsack und Verfahren zur Herstellung von einer verstärkten Gewebekante | ||
Former [2011/13] | Transport bag and method for producing a reinforced textile edge | ||
Former [2011/13] | Sac de transport et procédé de fabrication d'une lisière renforcée | Examination procedure | 07.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 19.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2010 | AL | 04.09.2019 | CY | 04.09.2019 | CZ | 04.09.2019 | DK | 04.09.2019 | EE | 04.09.2019 | ES | 04.09.2019 | FI | 04.09.2019 | HR | 04.09.2019 | IT | 04.09.2019 | LT | 04.09.2019 | LV | 04.09.2019 | MC | 04.09.2019 | MK | 04.09.2019 | MT | 04.09.2019 | NL | 04.09.2019 | PL | 04.09.2019 | SE | 04.09.2019 | SI | 04.09.2019 | SK | 04.09.2019 | SM | 04.09.2019 | TR | 04.09.2019 | IE | 15.09.2019 | LU | 15.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | BG | 04.12.2019 | GB | 04.12.2019 | NO | 04.12.2019 | GR | 05.12.2019 | IS | 05.01.2020 | PT | 06.01.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/26] | HU | 15.09.2010 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
TR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GB | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 15.09.2010 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GB | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 15.09.2010 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GB | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GB | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GB | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 04.09.2019 | |
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 04.09.2019 | |
NO | 04.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US1576191 (JELLEME WILLIAM O) [X] 1,14 * page 1, line 44 - page 2, line 95; figures 1-5; claims 1,3 * [I] 2-13,15-24; | [A]US3340919 (RENDER HOLBROOK THOMAS) [A] 1-24* the whole document *; | [X]US3470928 (SCHWARTZ HAROLD A) [X] 1,14 * column 3, lines 37-47; figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 69 - column 4, line 33 *; | [A]US4646357 (NATTRASS PETER J [US]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]US7179762 (BEASLEY JR ALONZO W [US]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE2340817 | EP0627513 | EP1514962 | AT10526U |