EP2287660 - Switchable array of birefringent lenses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AU Optronics Corporation No. 1, Li-Hsin Rd. 2, Hsinchu Science Park Hsinchu 30078 / TW | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woodgate, Graham John 9 Vicarage Road Henley-on-Thames Oxfordshire, RG9 1HF / GB | 02 /
Harrold, Jonathan 8 Robins Grove Warwick Warwickshire, CV34 6RF / GB | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Perkins, Janet Frances J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/08] | Merryweather, Colin Henry J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10010077.5 | 04.02.2004 | [2011/08] | Priority number, date | GB20030002658 | 05.02.2003 Original published format: GB 0302658 | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2287660 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2287660 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/29, G02B27/22, H04N13/00 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
G02F1/29 (EP,US);
G02B30/27 (EP,US);
G02B30/30 (EP);
H04N13/305 (EP,US);
H04N13/359 (EP,US);
G02F1/133526 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/08] | Title | German: | Schaltbare Anordnung doppelbrechender zylindrischer Linsen | [2011/08] | English: | Switchable array of birefringent lenses | [2011/08] | French: | Réseau commutable de lentilles biréfringentes de forme cylindrique | [2011/08] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 23.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2011 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 08.11.2011 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 19.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 26.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/06] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04707966.0 / EP1590708 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040707966) is 15.02.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]US6069650 (BATTERSBY STEPHEN J [GB]) [ID] 1-18 * column 1, lines 5-11 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, line 47 - line 52 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 5 * * column 4, lines 11-45 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 45 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 14 * * column 6, lines 32-54 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 20 * * figures 1-4, 6 *; | [A]US6288767 (MURATA AKIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 10, line 40 - column 11, line 65 * * column 12, lines 14-17 * * column 12, line 64 - column 13, line 3 ** figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US4959641 | EP0721131 | EP0829743 | EP0829744 | EP0833183 | WO9821620 | US6069650 | - SPIE PROCEEDINGS, (1996), vol. 2653, pages 32 - 39 | - PROC.SPIE VOL. 1915 STEREOSCOPIC DISPLAYS AND APPLICATIONS IV, (1993), pages 177 - 186 | - L.G. COMMANDER ET AL., "European Optical Society Topical Meetings Digest Series", ELECTRODE DESIGNS FOR TUNEABLE MICROLENSES, (19970515), vol. 13, pages 48 - 58 | - S.SUYAMA ET AL., "3D Display System with Dual Frequency Liquid Crystal Varifocal Lens", SID 97 DIGEST, pages 273 - 276 | - G.P. BRYAN-BROWN; C.V.BROWN; J.C.JONES; E.L.WOOD; I.C.SAGE; P.BRETT; J.RUDIN, "Grating aligned bistable Nematic device", SID 97 DIGEST, pages 37 - 40 | - A.E.A. CONTORET; S.R. FARRAR; P.O. JACKSON; S. M. KHAN; L. MAY; M. ONEILL; J.E.NICHOLLS; S.M. KELLY; G.J. RICHARDS, "Polarized Electroluminescence from an Anisotropic Nematic Network on a Non-contact Photoalignment Layer", ADV. MATER., (2000), vol. 12, no. 13, doi:doi:10.1002/1521-4095(200006)12:13<971::AID-ADMA971>3.0.CO;2-J, page 971, XP000937086 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-4095(200006)12:13<971::AID-ADMA971>3.0.CO;2-J |