EP2272900 - ETHYLENE-VINYL ALCOHOL COPOLYMER RESIN COMPOSITIONS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/02] | Ethylene-vinyl alcohol copolymer resin compositions and process for production thereof | ||
[2016/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2011/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Kaoru c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi okayama 710-0801 / JP | 02 /
Kida, Noriyuki c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 03 /
Shindome, Hiroyuki c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 04 /
Uchiumi, Naohiko c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1-2-1 Kaigan-dori Okayama-shi, Okayama 702-8601 / JP | [2016/39] |
Former [2011/02] | 01 /
Ikeda, Kaoru Kuraray Co. Ltd. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | ||
02 /
Kida, Noriyuki Kuraray Co. Ltd. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | |||
03 /
Shindome, Hiroyuki Kuraray Co. Ltd. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | |||
04 /
Uchiumi, Naohiko Kuraray Co. Ltd. 1-2-1 Kaigan-dori Okayama-shi Okayama 702-8601 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2016/39] |
Former [2011/02] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10010098.1 | 06.02.2003 | [2011/02] | Priority number, date | JP20020040651 | 18.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002040651 | JP20020314560 | 29.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002314560 | JP20020375379 | 25.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002375379 | [2011/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2272900 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2272900 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/205, C08L23/08 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
C08L23/0861 (EP,US);
C08J3/20 (KR);
B29B9/12 (EP,US);
C08F8/06 (KR);
C08J3/12 (EP,US);
C08J3/2053 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (KR);
C08K3/24 (EP,US);
C08K3/38 (EP,KR,US);
C09J123/08 (EP,US);
B29B9/06 (EP,US);
C08J2323/08 (EP,US);
C08J2329/04 (EP,US);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31681 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31692 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/24, C08L29/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/38, C08L29/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI [2016/39] |
Former [2011/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI | Title | German: | ETHYLENVINYLALKOHOL-COPOLYMERHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/19] | English: | ETHYLENE-VINYL ALCOHOL COPOLYMER RESIN COMPOSITIONS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2016/19] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE RÉSINE EN COPOLYMÈRE D'ALCOOL DE VINYLE D'ÉTHYLÈNE ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2016/19] |
Former [2011/02] | Ethylenvinylalkohol-Copolymerharzzusammensetzungen und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | ||
Former [2011/02] | Ethylene-vinyl alcohol copolymer resin compositions and process for production thereof | ||
Former [2011/02] | Compositions de résine en copolymère d'alcool de vinyle d'éthylène et leur procédé de production | Examination procedure | 08.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 01.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03706918.4 / EP1477514 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030706918) is 23.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.02.2003 | AT | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | PT | 30.01.2017 | IE | 06.02.2017 | LU | 06.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.02.2003 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
SE | 28.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0386720 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [A] 1-12* page 2, line 31 - page 4, line 37; example 1; claims 1-10 *; | [X]EP0814125 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [X] 1-12 * page 3, line 44 - page 4, line 17; example 3; claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP0930339 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0036]; example 3; claims 1-6 *; | [X]EP0990513 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0055]; example 1; claims 1-10 * | by applicant | WO9905213 | US6174949 | EP1090953 | JP2001164059 |