EP2273031 - Eavestrough cover for half round eavestroughs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brochu, Guy 785 Rue Leonard, No. 210 Quebec QC G1X 5H8 / CA | [2011/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/02] | Representative(s) | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Franz-Mayer-Str. 16a 93053 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Graf Glück Kritzenberger Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/02] | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Hermann-Köhl-Straße 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10010123.7 | 17.10.2008 | [2011/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2273031 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/076, E04D13/064 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
E04D13/064 (EP);
E04D13/076 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Abdeckung für halbrunde Dachrinnen | [2011/02] | English: | Eavestrough cover for half round eavestroughs | [2011/02] | French: | Couvercle à gouttières demi-rondes | [2011/02] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 07.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/40] | 23.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08018262.9 / EP2177685 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080018262) is 05.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1627973 (BROCHU GUY [CA]) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0017] , [0021] - [0024]; figures 4,5,6a,6b *[A] 2-5,7-9 |