EP2270220 - Method for diagnosing non-small cell lung cancers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oncotherapy Science, Inc. 2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Yusuke 17-33, Azamino 1-chome Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 225-0011 / JP | 02 /
Daigo, Yataro 201, 732-1, Futoo-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-0031 / JP | 03 /
Nakatsuru, Shuichi 6-2, Shimoochiai 2-chome Chuo-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 338-0002 / JP | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10010328.2 | 22.09.2003 | [2011/01] | Priority number, date | US20020414673P | 30.09.2002 Original published format: US 414673 P | US20030451374P | 28.02.2003 Original published format: US 451374 P | US20030466100P | 28.04.2003 Original published format: US 466100 P | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2270220 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2270220 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/12, G01N33/50, C12N15/11, A61P35/00, A61K39/00 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
G01N33/57423 (EP,KR);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,KR);
A61K31/7088 (EP,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,KR);
C12N15/1135 (EP,KR);
G01N33/15 (KR);
C12N2310/11 (EP,KR);
C12N2310/14 (EP,KR);
C12Q2600/136 (EP,KR);
C12Q2600/158 (KR);
G01N2800/50 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Diagnose von nicht-kleinzelligem Lungenkrebs | [2011/01] | English: | Method for diagnosing non-small cell lung cancers | [2011/01] | French: | Méthode de diagnostic du cancer du poumon non à petites cellules | [2011/01] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 21.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/36] | 29.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03753941.8 / EP1551998 | EP06022167.8 / EP1743947 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030753941) is 09.11.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0172775 (DIADEXUS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [I]WO0204514 (CORIXA CORP [US], et al) [I] 8 * sequence 1742 *; | [A] - FUJII TAKESHI ET AL, "A preliminary transcriptome map of non-small cell lung cancer.", CANCER RESEARCH. 15 JUN 2002, (20020615), vol. 62, no. 12, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 3340 - 3346, XP002349233 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - WIGLE DENNIS A ET AL, "Molecular profiling of non-small cell lung cancer and correlation with disease-free survival", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20020601), vol. 62, no. 11, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 3005 - 3008, XP002271233 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - BANGUR CHAITANYA S ET AL, "Identification of genes over-expressed in small cell lung carcinoma using suppression subtractive hybridization and cDNA microarray expression analysis.", ONCOGENE. 23 MAY 2002, (20020523), vol. 21, no. 23, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 3814 - 3825, XP002904254 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1205480 | [A] - VIRTANEN C ET AL, "Integrated classification of lung tumors and cell lines by expression profiling", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20020917), vol. 99, no. 19, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 12357 - 12362, XP002904255 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.192240599 | [A] - COJOCARU GADY ET AL, "Transcriptional profiling of non-small cell lung cancer using oligonucleotide microarrays.", CHEST. MAR 2002, (200203), vol. 121, no. 3 Suppl, ISSN 0012-3692, page 44S, XP002349234 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1378/chest.121.3_suppl.44S | [I] - SIOUD MOULDY ET AL, "Profiling the immune response in patients with breast cancer by phage-displayed cDNA libraries", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, WILEY - V C H VERLAG GMBH & CO. KGAA, DE, (20010301), vol. 31, no. 3, doi:10.1002/1521-4141(200103)31:3<716::AID-IMMU716>3.0.CO;2-9, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 716 - 725, XP002193380 [I] 8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-4141(200103)31:3<716::AID-IMMU716>3.0.CO;2-9 | [T] - POULSEN T T ET AL, "Specific sensitivity of small cell lung cancer cell lines to the snake venom toxin taipoxin", LUNG CANCER, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 50, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.LUNGCAN.2005.06.011, ISSN 0169-5002, (20051201), pages 329 - 337, (20051201), XP025286890 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.lungcan.2005.06.011 | by applicant | JPS6317688 | WO9203918 | WO9312227 | US5223409 | WO9402602 | WO9425585 | US5403484 | WO9633735 | WO9634096 | US5571698 | US5744305 | US2002103360 | - MITSUDOMI ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES, (2000), vol. 6, pages 4055 - 63 | - NIKLINSKI ET AL., LUNG CANCER., (2001), vol. 34, no. 2, pages 53 - 8 | - WATINE, BMJ, (2000), vol. 320, pages 379 - 80 | - FRY, W. A; PHILLIPS, J. L.; MENCK, H. R., "Ten-year survey of lung cancer treatment and survival in hospitals in the United States: a national cancer data base report", CANCER, (1999), vol. 86, pages 1867 - 76 | - "Chemotherapy in non-small cell lung cancer: a meta-analysis using updated data on individual patients from 52 randomised clinical trials. Non-small Cell Lung Cancer Collaborative Group", BMJ., (1995), vol. 311, pages 899 - 909 | - KRIS M, N. R; HERBST RS, "Aphase II trial of ZD1899 ('Iressa') in advanced non-small cell lung cancer (NSCLC) patients who had failed platinum- and docetaxel-based regimens (IDEAL 2)", PROC AM SOC CLIN ONCOL., (2002), vol. 21, no. A1166, page 292A | - OKABE ET AL., CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, pages 2129 - 37 | - KITAHARA ET AL., CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, pages 3544 - 9 | - LIN ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2002), vol. 21, pages 4120 - 8 | - HASEGAWA ET AL., CANCER RES, (2002), vol. 62, pages 7012 - 7 | - BIENZ; CLEVERS, CEL!, (2000), vol. 103, pages 311 - 20 | - HE ET AL., CELL, (1999), vol. 99, pages 335 - 45 | - LIN ET AL., CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, pages 6345 - 9 | - FUJITA ET AL., CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, pages 7722 - 6 | - BOON, INT J CANCER, (1993), vol. 54, pages 177 - 80 | - BOON; VAN DER BRUGGEN, J EXP MED, (1996), vol. 183, pages 725 - 9 | - VAN DER BRUGGEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, pages 1643 - 7 | - BRICHARD ET AL., J EXP MED, (1993), vol. 178, pages 489 - 95 | - KAWAKAMI ET AL., J EXP MED, (1994), vol. 180, pages 347 - 52 | - SHICHIJO ET AL., J EXP MED, (1998), vol. 187, pages 277 - 88 | - CHEN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 1914 - 8 | - UMANO ET AL., BRIT J CANCER, (2001), vol. 84, pages 1052 - 7 | - TANAKA ET AL., BRIT J CANCER, (2001), vol. 84, pages 94 - 9 | - NUKAYA ET AL., INT J CANCER, (1999), vol. 80, pages 92 - 7 | - ROSENBEG ET AL., NATURE MED, (1998), vol. 4, pages 321 - 7 | - MUKHERJI ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 8078 - 82 | - HU ET AL., CANCER RES, (1996), vol. 56, pages 2479 - 83 | - BOON; CAN DER BRUGGEN, J EXP MED, (1996), vol. 183, pages 725 - 9 | - HARRIS, J NATL CANCER INST, (1996), vol. 88, pages 1442 - 5 | - BUTTERFIELD ET AL., CANCER RES, (1999), vol. 59, pages 3134 - 42 | - VISSERS ET AL., CANCER RES, (1999), vol. 59, pages 5554 - 9 | - VAN DER BURG ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 156, pages 3308 - 14 | - TANAKA ET AL., CANCER RES, (1997), vol. 57, pages 4465 - 8 | - FUJIE ET AL., INT J CANCER, (1999), vol. 80, pages 169 - 72 | - KIKUCHI ET AL., INT J CANCER, (1999), vol. 81, pages 459 - 66 | - OISO ET AL., INT J CANCER, (1999), vol. 81, pages 387 - 94 | - KAWANO ET AL., CANCE RES, (2000), vol. 60, pages 3550 - 8 | - NISHIZAKA ET AL., CANCER RES, (2000), vol. 60, pages 4830 - 7 | - TAMURA ET AL., JPN J CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 92, pages 762 - 7 | - DATE ET AL., TISSUE ANTIGENS, (1996), vol. 47, pages 93 - 101 | - KONDO ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1995), vol. 155, pages 4307 - 12 | - KUBO ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1994), vol. 152, pages 3913 - 24 | - IMANISHI ET AL., Proceeding of the eleventh International Hictocompatibility Workshop and Conference, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1992), page 1065 | - WILLIAMS ET AL., TISSUE ANTIGEN, (1997), vol. 49, page 129 | - ALEXANDER-MILLER ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 4102 - 7 | - JANSEN; ZANGEMEISTER-WITTKE, LANCET ONCOL, (2002), vol. 3, pages 672 - 83 | - BRUMMENLKAMP ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 550 - 3 | - RIGBY, Genetic Engineering, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1982), vol. 3, pages 83 - 141 | - KIM ET AL., GENE, (1990), vol. 91, pages 217 - 23 | - NIWA ET AL., GENE, (1991), vol. 108, pages 193 - 200 | - CULLEN, METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1987), vol. 152, pages 684 - 704 | - TAKEBE ET AL., MOL CELL BIOL, (1988), vol. 8, page 466 | - SEED; ARUFFO, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 3365 - 9 | - GHEYSEN; FIERS, J MOL APPL GENET, (1982), vol. 1, pages 385 - 94 | - KAUFMAN ET AL., MOL CELL BIOL, (1989), vol. 9, page 946 | - CHU ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1987), vol. 15, pages 1311 - 26 | - CHEN; OKAYAMA, MOL CELL BIOL, (1987), vol. 7, pages 2745 - 52 | - LOPATA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1984), vol. 12, pages 5707 - 17 | - SUSSMAN; MILMAN, MOL CELL BIOL, (1985), vol. 4, pages 1642 - 3 | - DERIJARD, B, CELL, (1994), vol. 7, pages 1025 - 37 | - LAMB ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1993), vol. 5, pages 22 - 30 | - RABINDRAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, pages 230 - 4 | - EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (1995), vol. 13, pages 85 - 90 | - HARLOW; LANE, Antibodies, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PUBLICATIONS, (1988), pages 511 - 52 | - SKOLNIK ET AL., CELL, (1991), vol. 65, pages 83 - 90 | - DALTON; TREISMAN, CELL, (1992), vol. 68, pages 597 - 612 | - FIELDS; STERNGLANZ, TRENDS GENET, (1994), vol. 10, pages 286 - 92 | - WRIGHTON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 273, pages 458 - 64 | - VERDINE, NATURE, (1996), vol. 384, pages 11 - 13 | - HOGAN, NATURE, (1996), vol. 384, pages 17 - 9 | - LAM, ANTICANCER DRUG DES., (1997), vol. 12, page 145 | - DEWITT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, page 6909 | - ERB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, page 11422 | - ZUCKERMANN ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, page 2678 | - CHO ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, page 1303 | - CARELL ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1994), vol. 33, page 2059 | - CARELL ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1994), vol. 33, page 2061 | - GALLOP ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, page 1233 | - HOUGHTEN, BIO/TECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 13, page 412 | - LAM, NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, page 82 | - FODOR, NATURE, (1993), vol. 364, page 555 | - CULL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, page 1865 | - SCOTT; SMITH, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, page 386 | - DELVIN, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, page 404 | - CWIRLA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, page 6378 | - FELICI, J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, page 301 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 83 | - CO ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, pages 2968 - 76 | - BETTER M; HORWITZ, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1989), vol. 178, pages 476 - 96 | - PLUCKTHUN; SKERRA, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1989), vol. 178, pages 497 - 515 | - LAMOYI, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1986), vol. 121, pages 652 - 63 | - ROUSSEAUX ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1986), vol. 121, pages 663 - 9 | - BIRD; WALKER, TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (1991), vol. 9, pages 132 - 7 | - HASHIMOTO-GOTOH ET AL., GENE, (1995), vol. 152, pages 271 - 5 | - ZOLLER; SMITH, METHODS ENZYMOL, (1983), vol. 100, pages 468 - 500 | - KRAMER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1984), vol. 12, pages 9441 - 9456 | - KRAMER; FRITZ, METHODS ENZYMOL, (1987), vol. 154, pages 350 - 67 | - KUNKEL, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 488 - 92 | - KUNKEL, METHODS ENZYMOL, (1988), vol. 85, pages 2763 - 6 | - MARK ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 5662 - 6 | - ZOLLER; SMITH, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1982), vol. 10, pages 6487 - 500 | - DALBADIE-MCFARLAND ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1982), vol. 79, pages 6409 - 13 | - HOPP ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, pages 1204 - 10 | - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning 2nd ed., COLD SPRING HARBOR LAB. PRESS, (1989), pages 9.47 - 9.58 | - WILBUR; LIPMAN, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 726 - 30 | - CHIRGWIN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1979), vol. 18, pages 5294 - 9 | - CHOMCZYNSKI; SACCHI, ANAL BIOCHEM, (1987), vol. 162, pages 156 - 9 | - FROHMAN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 8998 - 9002 | - BELYAVSK-Y ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1989), vol. 17, pages 2919 - 32 | - GRANTHAM ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1981), vol. 9, pages 43 - 74 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, pages 544 - 6 | - FASEB J, (1992), vol. 6, pages 2422 - 7 | - BETTER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1041 - 3 | - LEI ET AL., J BACTERIOL, (1987), vol. 169, page 4379 | - NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1990), vol. 18, no. 17, page 5322 | - MULLIGAN ET AL., NATURE, (1979), vol. 277, page 108 | - MIZUSHIMA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1990), vol. 18, page 5322 | - GALFRE; MILSTEIN, METHODS ENZYMOL, (1981), vol. 73, pages 3 - 46 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 83 | - CO ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1994), vol. 152, pages 2968 - 76 | - BETTER; HORWITZ, METHODS ENZYMOL, (1989), vol. 178, pages 476 - 96 | - PLUCK-THUN; SKERRA, METHODS ENZYMOL, (1989), vol. 178, pages 497 - 515 | - LAMOYI, METHODS ENZYMOL, (1986), vol. 121, pages 652 - 63 | - ROUSSEAUX ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL, (1986), vol. 121, pages 663 - 9 | - BIRD; WALKER, TRENDS BIOTCCHNOL, (1991), vol. 9, pages 132 - 7 | - YANAGAWA ET AL., NEOPLASIA, (2001), vol. 3, pages 395 - 401 | - AKASHI, INT J CANCER, (2000), vol. 88, pages 873 - 80 | - AKASHI ET AL., INT J. CANCER, (2000), vol. 88, pages 873 - 80 | - SHIRATSUCHI ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (1998), vol. 247, pages 597 - 604 |