EP2292715 - Azeotrope-like compositions of tetrafluoropropene and trifluoroiodomethane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomas, Raymond H Honeywell International Inc 101 Columbia Road, PO Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | 02 /
Wilson, David P Honeywell International Inc 101 Columbia Road, PO Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | 03 /
Singh, Rajiv R Honeywell International Inc 101 Columbia Road, PO Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | 04 /
Pham, Hang T Honeywell International Inc 101 Columbia Road, PO Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [2012/34] |
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
Thomas, Raymond H Honeywell International Inc 101 Columbia Road, PO Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | ||
02 /
Wilson, David P Honeywell International Inc 101 Columbia Road, PO Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | |||
03 /
Singh, Rajiv R Honeywell International Inc 101 Columbia Road, PO Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | |||
04 /
Pham, Hang T Honeywell International Inc 101 Columbia Road, PO Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | Representative(s) | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10010492.6 | 18.04.2005 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | US20040826072 | 16.04.2004 Original published format: US 826072 | US20040826592 | 16.04.2004 Original published format: US 826592 | US20040826597 | 16.04.2004 Original published format: US 826597 | US20040826727 | 16.04.2004 Original published format: US 826727 | US20040826811 | 16.04.2004 Original published format: US 826811 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2292715 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2292715 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04, C08J9/00, C09K3/30 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
C08J9/146 (EP,US);
C09K5/04 (KR);
C09K3/30 (EP,US);
C09K5/02 (KR);
C09K5/045 (EP,US);
C11D7/5063 (EP,US);
C08J2205/052 (EP,US);
C08J2207/04 (EP,US);
C09K2205/122 (EP,US);
C09K2205/126 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/10] | Title | German: | Azeotropartige Zusammensetzungen aus Tetrafluorpropen und Trifluoriodmethan | [2011/10] | English: | Azeotrope-like compositions of tetrafluoropropene and trifluoroiodomethane | [2011/10] | French: | Compositions azéotropiques de tétrafluoropropène et de trifluoroiodométhane | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 08.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05736672.6 / EP1735397 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050736672) is 06.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2005 | AT | 22.08.2012 | BE | 22.08.2012 | CY | 22.08.2012 | CZ | 22.08.2012 | DK | 22.08.2012 | EE | 22.08.2012 | FI | 22.08.2012 | LT | 22.08.2012 | MC | 22.08.2012 | NL | 22.08.2012 | PL | 22.08.2012 | RO | 22.08.2012 | SE | 22.08.2012 | SI | 22.08.2012 | SK | 22.08.2012 | TR | 22.08.2012 | BG | 22.11.2012 | GR | 23.11.2012 | IS | 22.12.2012 | PT | 24.12.2012 | IE | 18.04.2013 | LU | 18.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
IE | 18.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
IE | 18.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08277389 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO9948993 (IKON CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2000178543 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0039242 (STAR REFRIGERATION [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2005105947 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * the whole document, particularly page 12, first paragraph * | by applicant | US2834748 | US2846458 | US2889379 | US2917480 | US4465786 | US4798818 | US5182040 | US5648017 | EP0974571 | US6516837 | - HELV. CHIM ACTA, (1962), vol. 47, page 1234 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1965), vol. 30, page 2931 | - SAVONA; BRUNO, J. NAT. PROD., (1983), vol. 46, page 594 | - DE LA TORRE ET AL., PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1990), vol. 29, page 668 | - SAUNDERS; FRISCH, Polyurethanes Chemistry and Technology, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1962), vol. I, II | US20040638003 |