EP2364047 - Mobile terminal and method for performing data communication using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/36] | Mobile terminal and method of managing and performing data communication using the same | ||
[2013/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryu, Sungjoon c/o LG ELectronics Inc.IP Group 327-23, Kasan-dong Kumchon-gu Seoul, 153-801 / KR | 02 /
Kong, Kwangsik c/o LG ELectronics Inc.IP Group 327-23, Kasan-dong Kumchon-gu Seoul, 153-801 / KR | 03 /
Jung, Juno c/o LG ELectronics Inc.IP Group 327-23, Kasan-dong Kumchon-gu Seoul, 153-801 / KR | 04 /
Lee, Wonjong c/o LG ELectronics Inc.IP Group 327-23, Kasan-dong Kumchon-gu Seoul, 153-801 / KR | 05 /
Kim, Bosoo c/o LG ELectronics Inc.IP Group 327-23, Kasan-dong Kumchon-gu Seoul, 153-801 / KR | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/36] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10010590.7 | 24.09.2010 | [2011/36] | Priority number, date | KR20090090984 | 25.09.2009 Original published format: KR 20090090984 | KR20090090985 | 25.09.2009 Original published format: KR 20090090985 | KR20090091619 | 28.09.2009 Original published format: KR 20090091619 | [2011/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2364047 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2364047 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/14, // H04W48/18, H04W88/06, H04W36/00, H04W52/02 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
H04W36/1443 (EP,US);
H04W36/0088 (EP,US);
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/36] | H04W48/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/36] | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät und Verfahren zur Durchführung einer Datenkommunikation damit | [2013/40] | English: | Mobile terminal and method for performing data communication using the same | [2013/40] | French: | Terminal mobile et procédé d'exécution de communication de données à l'aide de celui-ci | [2013/40] |
Former [2011/36] | Mobiles Endgerät und Verfahren zur Verwaltung sowie Durchführung einer Datenkommunikation damit | ||
Former [2011/36] | Mobile terminal and method of managing and performing data communication using the same | ||
Former [2011/36] | Terminal mobile et procédé de gestion et d'exécution de communication de données à l'aide de celui-ci | Examination procedure | 02.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 07.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2010 | AL | 22.01.2014 | AT | 22.01.2014 | BE | 22.01.2014 | BG | 22.01.2014 | CY | 22.01.2014 | CZ | 22.01.2014 | DK | 22.01.2014 | EE | 22.01.2014 | ES | 22.01.2014 | FI | 22.01.2014 | HR | 22.01.2014 | IT | 22.01.2014 | LT | 22.01.2014 | LV | 22.01.2014 | MC | 22.01.2014 | MK | 22.01.2014 | MT | 22.01.2014 | NL | 22.01.2014 | PL | 22.01.2014 | RO | 22.01.2014 | SE | 22.01.2014 | SI | 22.01.2014 | SK | 22.01.2014 | SM | 22.01.2014 | TR | 22.01.2014 | NO | 22.04.2014 | GR | 23.04.2014 | IS | 22.05.2014 | PT | 22.05.2014 | IE | 24.09.2014 | LU | 24.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
AT | 22.01.2014 | ||
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MK | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
TR | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
AT | 22.01.2014 | ||
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
TR | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
AT | 22.01.2014 | ||
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 22.01.2014 | |
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008207187 (MAILLARD HERVE [FR]); | [XI]US2008311912 (BALASUBRAMANIAN SRINIVASAN [US], et al); | [A]US2009016310 (RASAL DIGAMBAR L [IN]) |