EP2295574 - Human orphan G protein-coupled receptors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 6166 Nancy Ridge Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Ruoping 5296 Timber Branch Way San Diego CA 92130 / US | 02 /
Leonard, James, N. 10667 Viacha Drive San Diego CA 92124 / US | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10010658.2 | 13.10.1999 | [2011/11] | Priority number, date | US19980109213P | 20.11.1998 Original published format: US 109213 P | US19990120416P | 16.02.1999 Original published format: US 120416 P | US19990121852P | 26.02.1999 Original published format: US 121852 P | US19990123946P | 12.03.1999 Original published format: US 123946 P | US19990123949P | 12.03.1999 Original published format: US 123949 P | US19990136436P | 28.05.1999 Original published format: US 136436 P | US19990136437P | 28.05.1999 Original published format: US 136437 P | US19990136439P | 28.05.1999 Original published format: US 136439 P | US19990136567P | 28.05.1999 Original published format: US 136567 P | US19990137127P | 28.05.1999 Original published format: US 137127 P | US19990137131P | 28.05.1999 Original published format: US 137131 P | US19990141448P | 29.06.1999 Original published format: US 141448 P | US19990156653P | 29.09.1999 Original published format: US 156653 P | US19990156633P | 29.09.1999 Original published format: US 156633 P | US19990156555P | 29.09.1999 Original published format: US 156555 P | US19990156634P | 29.09.1999 Original published format: US 156634 P | US19990157280P | 01.10.1999 Original published format: US 157280 P | US19990157294P | 01.10.1999 Original published format: US 157294 P | US19990157281P | 01.10.1999 Original published format: US 157281 P | US19990157293P | 01.10.1999 Original published format: US 157293 P | US19990157282P | 01.10.1999 Original published format: US 157282 P | US19990417044 | 12.10.1999 Original published format: US 417044 | US19990416760 | 12.10.1999 Original published format: US 416760 | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2295574 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/72 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
C07K14/723 (EP);
C12N15/11 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/705 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/11] | Title | German: | Menschliche, an ein G-Protein gekoppelte Rezeptoren ohne bekannte Liganden | [2011/11] | English: | Human orphan G protein-coupled receptors | [2011/11] | French: | Récepteurs humains orphelins couplés à une protéine g | [2011/11] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 17.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/10] | 24.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05003040.2 / EP1584683 | EP07001452.7 / EP1780280 | EP99972682.1 / EP1133559 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990972682) is 24.10.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9720045 (COR THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [I] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [I]WO9724929 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US]) [I] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [I]WO9831810 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [I] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [I]EP0860502 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]) [I] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [I]WO9850549 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [E]WO0022131 (ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al) [E] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [E]WO0022129 (ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al) [E] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [E]WO0124532 (CONEXANT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [E] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [I] - STADEL J M ET AL, "Orphan G protein-coupled receptors: a neglected opportunity for pioneer drug discovery", TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, ELSEVIER, HAYWARTH, GB, (19971101), vol. 18, no. 11, ISSN 0165-6147, pages 430 - 437, XP004099345 [I] 1-34 * the whole document * | [I] - O'DOWD B F ET AL, "Discovery of Three Novel G-Protein-Coupled Receptor Genes", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, US, (19980115), vol. 47, no. 2, doi:10.1006/GENO.1998.5095, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 310 - 313, XP004449298 [I] 1-34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1998.5095 | [I] - MATSUOKA ET AL, "Identification of novel members of G-protein coupled receptor subfamily", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (19930715), vol. 194, no. 1, doi:10.1006/BBRC.1993.1848, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 504 - 511, XP002102959 [I] 1-34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1993.1848 | [I] - WENG ET AL, "A DNA damage and stress inducible G protein-coupled receptor blocks cells in G2/M", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES (PNAS), NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, US, (19981001), vol. 95, doi:10.1073/PNAS.95.21.12334, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 12334 - 12339, XP002095309 [I] 1-34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.21.12334 | [T] - ODA T ET AL, "Molecular cloning and characterization of a novel type of histamine receptor preferentially expressed in leukocytes", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, INC, US, (20001124), vol. 275, no. 47, doi:10.1074/JBC.M006480200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 36781 - 36786, XP008047461 [T] 1-34 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M006480200 | by applicant | - KENAKIN, T., LIFE SCIENCES, (1988), vol. 43, page 1095 |