EP2338373 - Decorative article having white coating and method for manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO., LTD. 1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo / JP | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miya, Yukio c/o Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. 1-12 Tanashi-cho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | 02 /
Naoi, Koichi c/o Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. 1-12 Tanashi-cho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | 03 /
Tase, Fumio c/o Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. 1-12 Tanashi-cho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | 04 /
Tanokura, Yukio c/o Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. 1-12 Tanashi-cho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | [2014/38] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
Miya, Yukio c/o Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. 1-12 Tanashi-cho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | ||
02 /
Naoi, Koichi c/o Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. 1-12 Tanashi-cho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | |||
03 /
Tase, Fumio c/o Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. 1-12 Tanashi-cho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | |||
04 /
Tanokura, Yukio c/o Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. 1-12 Tanashi-cho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | Representative(s) | Rüedi, Regula Béatrice C/o E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [2014/38] |
Former [2011/26] | Rüedi, Regula Béatrice C/o E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 10010685.5 | 26.12.2002 | [2011/26] | Priority number, date | JP20010400629 | 28.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001400629 | JP20020001953 | 09.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002001953 | JP20020148793 | 23.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002148793 | [2011/26] | Previously filed application, date | WO2002JP13661 | 26.12.2002 | [2011/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2338373 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2338373 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2338373 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A44C27/00, C23C14/06, C23C28/00, C25D7/00, G04B37/22, G04B19/06, C23C14/02 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
A44C27/005 (EP,US);
A44C27/00 (KR);
A44C27/006 (EP,US);
C23C14/0015 (EP,US);
C23C14/024 (EP,US);
C23C14/16 (EP,US);
C23C28/321 (EP,US);
C23C28/322 (EP,US);
C23C28/34 (EP,US);
C23C28/341 (EP,US);
C23C28/343 (EP,US);
C23C28/347 (EP,US);
C23C28/36 (EP,US);
C25D3/48 (EP,US);
C25D3/62 (EP,US);
G04B37/22 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4959 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49597 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12576 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12806 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12875 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12889 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12896 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12993 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24959 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2011/26] | Title | German: | Dekorationsartikel mit weißer Beschichtung und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2011/26] | English: | Decorative article having white coating and method for manufacture thereof | [2011/26] | French: | Article décoratif doté d'une couche blanche et son procédé de fabrication | [2011/26] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 31.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02790897.9 / EP1459644 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020790897) is 21.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06272019 ; | [A]US5985469 (KURAKATA RYO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941226), vol. 018, no. 686, Database accession no. (C - 1292), & JP06272019 A 19940927 (SEIKO INSTR INC) [X] 1,2,4-8 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS645130 | JPH03120355 | JP2000192077 | JP2001333236 | WO0200958 |