EP2258792 - Compositions comprising a fluoroolefin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minor, Barbara, Haviland 233 Greenhaven Drive Elkton, Maryland 21921 / US | 02 /
Rao, Velliyur, Nott, Mallikarjuna 1 Georgetown Avenue Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10010782.0 | 03.03.2006 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | US20050658543P | 04.03.2005 Original published format: US 658543 P | US20050710439P | 23.08.2005 Original published format: US 710439 P | US20050732769P | 01.11.2005 Original published format: US 732769 P | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2258792 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2258792 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04, C08J9/14 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
C10M171/008 (EP);
C08J9/146 (EP);
C08J9/149 (EP);
C09K5/045 (EP);
C08J2203/12 (EP);
C08J2203/14 (EP);
C08J2203/162 (EP);
C08J2203/182 (EP);
C08J2207/04 (EP);
C08J2375/04 (EP);
C09K2205/126 (EP);
C09K2205/22 (EP);
C09K2205/32 (EP);
C09K2205/40 (EP);
C10M2203/065 (EP);
C10M2203/1006 (EP);
C10M2205/0206 (EP);
C10M2207/2835 (EP);
C10M2209/043 (EP);
C10M2209/1033 (EP);
C10N2020/101 (EP);
C10N2020/103 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen mit einem Fluorolefin | [2010/49] | English: | Compositions comprising a fluoroolefin | [2010/49] | French: | Compositions comprenant une fluorooléfine | [2010/49] | Examination procedure | 01.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 07.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/10] | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06737345.6 / EP1853679 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060737345) is 03.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004037913 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al); | [XI]US2004127383 (PHAM HANG T [US], et al) | by applicant | US20040910495 | US20050062044 |