EP2319397 - Wavelet-based analysis of pulse oximetry signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nellcor Puritan Bennett Ireland Michael Collins Road Mervue Galway / IE | [2011/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Addison, Paul Stanley 58 Buckstone Road Edinburgh Midlothian EH10 6UR / GB | 02 /
Watson, James Nicholas 116 Lochview Drive Hogganfield Glasgow G33 1QF / GB | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Atholl Exchange 6 Canning Street Edinburgh EH3 8EG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Atholl Exchange 6 Canning Street Edinburgh EH3 8EG / GB | ||
Former [2013/23] | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | ||
Former [2011/19] | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10010844.8 | 21.06.2002 | [2011/19] | Priority number, date | GB20020006382 | 19.03.2002 Original published format: GB 0206382 | GB20010015284 | 22.06.2001 Original published format: GB 0115284 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2319397 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2319397 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G06K9/00, // A61B5/0205 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
A61B5/14551 (EP,US);
A61B5/6816 (EP,US);
A61B5/6826 (EP,US);
A61B5/6838 (EP,US);
A61B5/726 (EP,US);
A61B5/0205 (EP,US);
A61B5/7207 (EP,US);
A61B5/7264 (EP,US);
A61B5/742 (EP,US);
G06F2218/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2011/19] | Title | German: | Wavelet-basierte Analyse von Pulsoximetriesignalen | [2011/19] | English: | Wavelet-based analysis of pulse oximetry signals | [2011/19] | French: | Analyse à base d'ondelettes de signaux d'oxymétrie de pouls | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 26.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02735636.9 / EP1399056 | EP09003012.3 / EP2067437 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020735636) is 31.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.06.2013 | BE | 05.06.2013 | CY | 05.06.2013 | DK | 05.06.2013 | FI | 05.06.2013 | IT | 05.06.2013 | MC | 05.06.2013 | NL | 05.06.2013 | SE | 05.06.2013 | TR | 05.06.2013 | IE | 21.06.2013 | LU | 21.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | GR | 06.09.2013 | ES | 16.09.2013 | PT | 07.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 21.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 21.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 21.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 21.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 21.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
ES | 16.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6011985 (ATHAN STEPHAN PETER [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 5, line 48 - column 11, line 39; figure 2A *; | [A]US6117075 (BARNEA OFER [IL]) [A] 1,9 * column 4, line 38 - column 7, line 20; figure 4 *; | [A]US6135966 (KO GARY KAM-YUEN [CA]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A]WO0077675 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US6208951 (KUMAR VIRUTHIAMPARAMBATH RAVI [IN], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 2, line 1 - column 6, line 37 * * column 7, line 30 - column 9, line 33 *; | [A]WO0125802 (NTC TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1,9 * page 8, line 7 - line 30 * * page 10, line 17 - line 30 * * page 12, line 8 - page 13, line 3 * * page 17, line 30 - page 18, line 16 * * page 23, line 24 - page 24, line 31 *; | [AP]WO0182099 (UNIV NAPIER [GB], et al) [AP] 1,9* the whole document * |