EP2308794 - Industrial truck led by a drawbar, in particular fork lift [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OM Carrelli Elevatori S.p.A. Viale A. De Gasperi 7 20020 Lainate (MI) / IT | [2014/13] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states STILL SAS 6 Boulevard Michael Faraday Serris 77716 Marne La Vallée Cedex 4 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wident, Alain 53, rue de l'Eglise 60480 Reuil sur Brèche / FR | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Geirhos, Johann Geirhos & Waller Partnerschaft Landshuter Allee 14 80637 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Geirhos, Johann Geirhos & Waller Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Landshuter Allee 14 80637 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/15] | Geirhos, Johann c/o Geirhos & Waller Landshuter Allee 14 80637 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10011280.4 | 28.09.2010 | [2011/15] | Priority number, date | DE20091049058 | 12.10.2009 Original published format: DE102009049058 | DE20091051678 | 03.11.2009 Original published format: DE102009051678 | [2011/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2308794 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2308794 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2308794 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/20, B62B3/06, B62D51/00, B66F9/075, B62B5/00, B62B5/06, B62D51/04 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
B66F9/20 (EP);
B62B3/0612 (EP);
B62B5/0069 (EP);
B62B5/063 (EP);
B62D51/001 (EP);
B62D51/04 (EP);
B66F9/07568 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/15] | B66F9/20, B62B3/06, B62D51/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | Deichselgeführtes Flurföderzeug, insbesondere Hubwagen | [2011/15] | English: | Industrial truck led by a drawbar, in particular fork lift | [2011/15] | French: | Chariot de manutention commandé par timon, en particulier chariot élévateur | [2011/15] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 10.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2010 | AL | 20.08.2014 | CY | 20.08.2014 | CZ | 20.08.2014 | DK | 20.08.2014 | EE | 20.08.2014 | ES | 20.08.2014 | FI | 20.08.2014 | HR | 20.08.2014 | LT | 20.08.2014 | LV | 20.08.2014 | MC | 20.08.2014 | MK | 20.08.2014 | MT | 20.08.2014 | NL | 20.08.2014 | PL | 20.08.2014 | RO | 20.08.2014 | SI | 20.08.2014 | SK | 20.08.2014 | SM | 20.08.2014 | TR | 20.08.2014 | IE | 28.09.2014 | LU | 28.09.2014 | BE | 30.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | BG | 20.11.2014 | GB | 20.11.2014 | NO | 20.11.2014 | GR | 21.11.2014 | IS | 20.12.2014 | PT | 22.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 28.09.2010 | |
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MK | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
TR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.09.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GB | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 28.09.2010 | |
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
TR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.09.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GB | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.09.2010 | |
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GB | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CY | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GB | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GB | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GB | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GB | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GB | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | DK | 20.08.2014 | |
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 20.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2007137904 (ROSE TIMOTHY L [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0034] * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,7,8; | [YD]EP1238896 (M L M [FR]) [YD] 2,7,8 * abstract * * figure - *; | [AD]EP1016569 (BT IND AB [SE]) [AD] 6 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE10159565 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 7,8 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1016569 | DE102006001689 | EP1238896 |