EP2308918 - Organic, open cell foam materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Aerogel Corporation 460 Buffalo Road Rochester, NY 14611 / US | [2011/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albert, Donald F. 68 Morris Hubbard Road Higganum, CT 06441 / US | 02 /
Andrews, Greg R. 9 Via del Pinar Monterey, CA 93940 / US | 03 /
Bruno, Joseph W. 4 Staba Drive Higganum, CT 06441 / US | [2011/24] |
Former [2011/15] | 01 /
Albert, Donald F. 68 Morris Hubbard Road Higganum, CT 06441 / US | ||
02 /
Andrews, Greg R. Apartment 2 51 Atlantic Avenue Rochester, NY 14607 / US | |||
03 /
Bruno, Joseph W. 4 Staba Drive Higganum, CT 06441 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10011295.2 | 04.10.2001 | [2011/15] | Priority number, date | US20010809793 | 16.03.2001 Original published format: US 809793 | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2308918 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2308918 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/28 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
C08J9/28 (EP);
C04B38/0022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2011/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Organische offenzellige Schaummaterialien | [2011/15] | English: | Organic, open cell foam materials | [2011/15] | French: | Matériaux de mousse à cellules ouvertes organiques | [2011/15] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/41] | 12.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01981820.2 / EP1406958 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010981820) is 12.05.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2011 | 28.09.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2011 | 28.09.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2011 | 28.09.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2011 | 28.09.2010 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2011 | 28.09.2010 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2011 | 28.09.2010 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2011 | 31.10.2010 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2011 | 31.10.2012 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   10.04.2013 | 31.10.2013 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9306044 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US]) [X] 1-12,14,15 * page 27, lines 15-25 ** page 28, lines 11-17 *; | [X]US5654345 (GRINSHPUN VYACHESLAV S [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * example 2 *; | [X]US5811031 (JANSEN ROLF-MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-12,14,15 * example 1; claim 1 * * column 3, lines 19-22 * * column 2, lines 55-59 *; | [X]US5908896 (MAYER STEVEN T [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * example 3; claims 1,5 *; | [XD]US6121337 (HAMMEL HOWARD SIMS [US], et al) [XD] 1-12 * table II *; | [X] - TAMON H ET AL, "Porous structure of organic and carbon aerogels synthesized by sol-gel polycondensation of resorcinol with formaldehyde", CARBON, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, (1997), vol. 35, no. 6, doi:10.1016/S0008-6223(97)00024-9, ISSN 0008-6223, pages 791 - 796, XP004073599 [X] 13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6223(97)00024-9 |