EP2277953 - Phosphonylated derivatives of polyalkylene oxide polymers and applications thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): BE | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poly-Med Inc. 6309 Highway 187 Anderson, SC 29625 / US | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shalaby, Shalaby W. 6309 Highway 187 Anderson, SC 29625 / US | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/04] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10011618.5 | 14.12.1999 | [2012/07] | Priority number, date | US19990116408P | 19.01.1999 Original published format: US 116408 P | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2277953 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2277953 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2277953 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/02, C08G65/327 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
C08F8/40 (EP,US);
C08G79/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/04] | C08L101/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/04] | Title | German: | Phosphonylierte Derivate von Polyalkylenoxidpolymeren und Anwendungen derselben | [2014/02] | English: | Phosphonylated derivatives of polyalkylene oxide polymers and applications thereof | [2011/04] | French: | Dérivés phosphonylés de polymères polyalkylène oxides et leurs appplications | [2014/02] |
Former [2011/04] | Phosponylierte Derivate Polyalkylenoxidpolymerer und Anwendungen derselben | ||
Former [2011/04] | Dérivés de polymères polyalkylène oxides et leurs appplications | Examination procedure | 26.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 19.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99250437.3 / EP1022315 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990250437) is 13.08.2004 | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.07.2014 | BE | 09.07.2014 | CY | 09.07.2014 | DK | 09.07.2014 | ES | 09.07.2014 | FI | 09.07.2014 | IT | 09.07.2014 | MC | 09.07.2014 | SE | 09.07.2014 | GR | 10.10.2014 | PT | 10.11.2014 | GB | 14.12.2014 | IE | 14.12.2014 | LU | 14.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | FR | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/27] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
GB | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
GB | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
GB | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 09.07.2014 | |
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 09.07.2014 | |
SE | 09.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5558517 (SHALABY SHALABY W [US], et al) [AD] 1-8 * claim 1 *; | [AD]US5491198 (SHALABY SHALABY W [US], et al) [AD] 1-8 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0395427 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;; example 1 *; | [A]GB2319251 (ALBRIGHT & WILSON UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-8 * claim 1 *; | [AD]US4678840 (FONG DODD W [US], et al) [AD] 1-8 * claim 1 *; | [AD]US3278464 (BOYER NICODEMUS E, et al) [AD] 1-8 * claim 1 *; | [AD]US4207405 (MASLER WILLIAM F [US], et al) [AD] 1-8 * claim 2 *; | [AD]US4966934 (HUANG CHIN-TEH [US], et al) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3097194 | US3278464 | US4207405 | US3069372 | US4678840 | US4774262 | US4581415 | US4500684 | US4814423 | US4966934 | US5491198 | US5558517 | - SHALABY ET AL., J. POLYM. SCI.-POLYM. PHYS. ED., (1973), vol. 11, page 1 | - SHALABY; REIMSCHUESSEL, J. POLYM. SCI.-POLYM. CHEM. ED., (1977), vol. 15, page 251 |