Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010014766 | ![]() | 04.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18333608 | 31.07.2008 | US18335908 | 31.07.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010014765 | ![]() | 04.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18333608 | 31.07.2008 | US18335908 | 31.07.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006112889 | ![]() | 26.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014057872 | ![]() | 27.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | US201314065542 | 29.10.2013 | US64332109 | 21.12.2009 | US28687505 | 23.11.2005 | US201113335446 | 22.12.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013331361 | ![]() | 12.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | US201213544377 | 09.07.2012 | US201313964359 | 12.08.2013 | US63710009 | 14.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013183353 | ![]() | 18.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | US18335908 | 31.07.2008 | US28687505 | 23.11.2005 | US201313782495 | 01.03.2013 | US63835909 | 15.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013177645 | ![]() | 11.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | US63730909 | 14.12.2009 | US18333608 | 31.07.2008 | US28687505 | 23.11.2005 | US201313778989 | 27.02.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8535718 | ![]() | 17.09.2013 | B2 | US2013012478 | 10.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | US201213544377 | 09.07.2012 | US63710009 | 14.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012094960 | ![]() | 19.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | US64332109 | 21.12.2009 | US28687505 | 23.11.2005 | US201113335446 | 22.12.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010119559 | ![]() | 13.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | US64332109 | 21.12.2009 | US28687505 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8409615 | ![]() | 02.04.2013 | B2 | US2010113395 | 06.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | US18335908 | 31.07.2008 | US28687505 | 23.11.2005 | US63835909 | 15.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8409614 | ![]() | 02.04.2013 | B2 | US2010113394 | 06.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | US63730909 | 14.12.2009 | US18333608 | 31.07.2008 | US28687505 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8246989 | ![]() | 21.08.2012 | B2 | US2010086593 | 08.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | US63710009 | 14.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008287400 | ![]() | 20.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | US18335908 | 31.07.2008 | US28687505 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008286359 | ![]() | 20.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | US18333608 | 31.07.2008 | US28687505 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7645460 | ![]() | 12.01.2010 | B2 | US2006110452 | 25.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | US28687505 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7645459 | ![]() | 12.01.2010 | B2 | US2005260262 | 24.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20130063041 | ![]() | 13.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101411117B | ![]() | 25.06.2014 | B1 | KR20120104446 | 20.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101388777B | ![]() | 23.04.2014 | B1 | KR20110018465 | 23.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101280138B | ![]() | 28.06.2013 | B1 | KR20110002887 | 10.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | WO2005US42887 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101070205B | ![]() | 06.10.2011 | B1 | KR20070111551 | 21.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011529902 | ![]() | 15.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US18333608 | 31.07.2008 | US18335908 | 31.07.2008 | WO2009US52173 | 30.07.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011529901 | ![]() | 15.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US18333608 | 31.07.2008 | US18335908 | 31.07.2008 | WO2009US52172 | 30.07.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4788765B | ![]() | 05.10.2011 | B2 | JP2008535912 | 04.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | WO2005US42887 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4605221B | ![]() | 05.01.2011 | B2 | JP2008500339 | 10.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL268462 | ![]() | 26.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | WO2005US42887 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2269584 | ![]() | 13.04.2022 | B1 | EP2269584 | 05.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | EP05735411 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1868584 | ![]() | 26.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | WO2005US42887 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1753395 | ![]() | 28.07.2010 | B1 | EP1753395 | 21.02.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008202652B | ![]() | 11.02.2010 | B2 | AU2008202652 | 10.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2008202652 | 16.06.2008 | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | AU2005247299 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005330654B | ![]() | 23.06.2011 | B2 | AU2005330654 | 26.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | WO2005US42887 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005247299B | ![]() | 15.05.2008 | B2 | AU2005247299 | 08.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2283825 | ![]() | 13.04.2022 | B1 | EP2283825 | 16.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | EP10006061 | 14.04.2005 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | EP05735411 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE475412T | 15.08.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0511530 | 02.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0520082 | 14.04.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | WO2005US42887 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2566798 | 08.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2602188 | 13.10.2009 | C | CA2602188 | 26.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | WO2005US42887 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2675652 | 26.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | CA2602188 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101166519 | 23.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104027323 | 10.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1111259T | 05.08.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | EP05735411 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1125501T | 16.02.2024 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | EP05735411 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005022578D1 | 09.09.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1753395T | 08.11.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2283825T | 27.06.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | EP10006061 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20100583T | 31.12.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL179090 | 30.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN827DELNP2012 | 26.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | WO2005US42887 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA29681 | 01.08.2008 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007012821 | 20.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | WO2005US42887 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA06013575 | 08.02.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20065969L | 23.02.2007 | L | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20075834L | 14.11.2007 | L | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | WO2005US42887 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ551118 | 30.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ561708 | 31.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ56170805 | 23.11.2005 | WO2005US42887 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ587774 | 30.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | NZ55111805 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1753395T | 31.01.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | EP05735411 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2381791 | 20.02.2010 | C2 | RU2007136046 | 20.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1753395T | 31.01.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | EP05735411 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMP200600038B | 27.12.2006 | B | SMAP200600038 | 27.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | WO2005US12537 | 14.04.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMP200700047B | 21.11.2007 | B | SMAP200700047 | 21.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US10681605 | 15.04.2005 | WO2005US42887 | 23.11.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005115331 | ![]() | 19.01.2006 | A3 | WO2005115331 | 08.12.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080083068 | ![]() | 12.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20070015596 | ![]() | 05.02.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010275319 | ![]() | 09.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR049022 | 21.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR098686 | 08.06.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102225047B | 18.09.2013 | B | CN102225047 | 26.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1956706 | 02.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2349584T | 05.01.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2921141T | 18.08.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2921364T | 24.08.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1161130 | 24.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE059143T | 28.10.2022 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA28657 | 01.06.2007 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY144704 | 31.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20060256 | 04.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2283825T | 16.08.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1753395E | 21.10.2010 | E | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2269584T | 01.07.2022 | T | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2283825T | 30.06.2022 | T | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS51562 | 31.08.2011 | B | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2359678 | 27.06.2009 | C2 | RU2006140888 | 27.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI351285B | 01.11.2011 | B | TW200607514 | 01.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201138783 | 16.11.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200609446 | 28.11.2007 | B | Priority number | Date | US57388104 | 24.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | EP1753395 | EP2269584 |