EP2320646 - Digital signal processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.2017 [2017/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yanagihara, Naofumi Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Komuro, Teruyoshi Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Shima, Hisato Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2011/19] | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10012164.9 | 20.12.1996 | [2011/19] | Priority number, date | JP19950350918 | 25.12.1995 Original published format: JP 35091895 | JP19950352830 | 28.12.1995 Original published format: JP 35283095 | JP19950352831 | 28.12.1995 Original published format: JP 35283195 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2320646 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
H04L12/40058 (EP,US);
G11B5/09 (KR);
H04L12/40071 (EP,US);
H04L12/40117 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/2368 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/4325 (EP,US);
H04N21/434 (EP,US);
H04N21/4341 (EP,US);
H04N21/4345 (EP,US);
H04N21/4347 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/43632 (EP,US);
H04N21/4402 (EP,US);
H04N21/440281 (EP,US);
H04N5/783 (EP,US);
H04N7/162 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/19] | Title | German: | Digitale Datenverarbeitung | [2011/19] | English: | Digital signal processing | [2011/19] | French: | Traitement d'un signal numérique | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 07.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.02.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/05] | 16.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/05] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04076509.1 / EP1469675 | EP96309376.0 / EP0782332 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960309376) is 24.10.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9323958 (MARKET DATA CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9418763 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [FR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0618728 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 17, lines 15-30 * * figures 1-9 *; | [A]EP0624983 (RCA THOMSON LICENSING CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9519091 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1-15* page 13, line 23 - page 14, line 16; figure 7 *; | [A]WO9527977 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 10, line 22 - page 11, line 11 * * page 13, line 21 - page 14, line 2 * * page 32, line 16 - line 26 *; | [Y]EP0679028 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 4, lines 15-24 * * column 15, lines 30-53 * * column 18, line 16 - column 19, line 8 * * figures 1-10 *; | [A]US5477263 (O'CALLAGHAN DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - INTERNATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR STANDARDISATION ED - INTERNATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR STANDARDIZATION = ORGANISATION INTERNATIONALE, INTERNATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR STANDARDISATION: INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY GENERIC CODING OF MOVING PICTURES AND ASSOCIATED AUDIO INFORMATION, PASSAGE, INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - GENERIC CODING OF MOVING PICTURES AND ASSOCIATED AUDIO INFORMATION. PART 1: SYSTEMS. DRAFT INTERNATIONAL STANDARD ISO/IEC DIS 13818-1, GENEVA, ISO, CH, PAGE(S) 20 - 36, (19940101), XP002066803 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - SARGINSON P A, "MPEG-2: a tutorial introduction to the systems layer", 19950101, (19950101), pages 4/1 - 413, XP006529329 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - KUNZMAN A J ET AL, "1394 HIGH PERFORMANCE SERIAL BUS: THE DIGITAL INTERFACE FOR ATV", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19950801), vol. 41, no. 3, doi:10.1109/30.468067, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 893 - 900, XP000539552 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.468067 | [A] - STAMMNITZ P ET AL, "HARDWARE IMPLEMENTATION OF THE TRANSPORT STREAM DEMULTIPLEXER FOR THE HDTVT DEMONSTRATOR", SIGNAL PROCESSING OF HDTV. PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONALWORKSHOP ON HDTV, XX, XX, (19941026), pages 435 - 441, XP000991025 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | US5420866 | EP0749244 | by applicant | - Digital Video Reader, illust., OHM CO., (19950825), pages 140 - 152 |