Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] |
26.08.2016 | Change - representative | |
27.06.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
12.01.2016 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.11.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.02.2014 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
13.12.2013 | Change - representative | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
13.12.2013 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
30.11.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.08.2013 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
16.08.2013 | First examination report | |
28.11.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.03.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
09.12.2011 | Publication of search report | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] |
09.12.2011 | Change - classification | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] |
29.11.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.11.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] |