Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03043368 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB0102118 | 12.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9049052 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2015 | B2 | US2011216761 | 08.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB0102118 | 12.11.2001 | US49483104 | 13.09.2004 | US201113022761 | 08.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7912079 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2011 | B2 | US2005013315 | 20.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB0102118 | 12.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1444854 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2011 | B1 | EP1444854 | 11.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB0102118 | 12.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2378787 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2012 | A3 | EP2378787 | 19.10.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP01982645 | 12.11.2001 | IB0102118 | 12.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE502486T | 15.04.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | IB0102118 | 12.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60144250D1 | 28.04.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | IB0102118 | 12.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1444854E | 29.06.2011 | E | Priority number | Date | IB0102118 | 12.11.2001 | Type | Earlier application | EP1444854 |