EP2333723 - Method of color customization of content screen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inada, Takahiro c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Motomiya, Yukie c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Nomura, Shigetoyo c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Tadano, Kanji c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2011/24] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2011/24] | Application number, filing date | 10012304.1 | 30.09.2010 | [2011/24] | Priority number, date | JP20090228553 | 30.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009228553 | JP20100017783 | 29.01.2010 Original published format: JP 2010017783 | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2333723 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2333723 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
G06T11/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Farbanpassung eines Inhaltsbildschirms | [2011/24] | English: | Method of color customization of content screen | [2011/24] | French: | Procédé de personnalisation de couleurs d'écran de contenu | [2011/24] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 04.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/36] | 22.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2003174866 (POYNTER WILLIAM DOUGLAS [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * * figures 3-5 * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0060] * [Y] 4,12,13 [I] 3,5,8-11,14,15; | [YA]US2004001072 (NEWMAN TODD [US]) [Y] 12,13 * figure 5 * [A] 1-11,14,15 | [YA] - W3C, "G18: Ensuring that a contrast ratio of at least 4.5:1 exists between text (and images of text) and background behind the text", (20081217), pages 1 - 2, www.w3.org, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20081217141248/http://www.w3.org/TR/WCAG20-TECHS/G18.html, (20130703), XP002699980 [Y] 4 * the whole document * [A] 1-3,5-15 | by applicant | JP2009228553 | JP2010017783 | JP2008182513 | JP2009027605 | JP2008153749 |