25.08.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
16.09.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] |
14.09.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
13.09.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.09.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.05.2016 |
Change - German title |
published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] |
27.05.2016 |
Change - French title |
published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] |
06.11.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.07.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.04.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
11.01.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.09.2012 |
First examination report |
|
05.09.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.06.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.03.2012 |
Publication of search report |
published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |
23.03.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |
02.08.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] |
17.12.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] |
19.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|