Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101181375B | Global Dossier | 19.09.2012 | B1 | KR20070048173 | 08.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US89990204 | 27.07.2004 | WO2005US24917 | 13.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4638492B | Global Dossier | 23.02.2011 | B2 | JP2008508682 | 21.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US89990204 | 27.07.2004 | WO2005US24917 | 13.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1779446 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2011 | B1 | EP1779446 | 02.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89990204 | 27.07.2004 | WO2005US24917 | 13.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2276089 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2016 | B1 | EP2276089 | 25.04.2012 | A3 | EP2276089 | 19.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US89990204 | 27.07.2004 | EP05775481 | 13.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005027708D1 | 09.06.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US89990204 | 27.07.2004 | WO2005US24917 | 13.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006019857 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89990204 | 27.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7316756 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2008 | B2 | US2006022592 | 02.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89990204 | 27.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100514704C | 15.07.2009 | C | CN101019249 | 15.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US89990204 | 27.07.2004 | Type | Earlier application | EP1779446 |