EP2278742 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR WIRELESS TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/04] | Apparatus and method for wireless transmission | ||
[2016/26] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue Suite 200 Torrance CA 90503 / US | ||
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Yutaka c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Takabayashi, Shinichiro c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Orihashi, Masayuki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Matsuoka, Akihiko c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | Heinze, Ekkehard Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10012604.4 | 22.08.2002 | [2011/04] | Priority number, date | JP20010257027 | 27.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001257027 | JP20020231976 | 08.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002231976 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2278742 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2278742 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04B1/692, H04L1/00, H04L27/00 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
H04B1/692 (EP,US);
H04L27/26 (KR);
H04L5/0058 (US);
H04L1/0001 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (US);
H04L27/0008 (EP,US);
H04L27/2601 (US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04L5/0021 (EP,US);
H04L5/006 (EP,US);
H04L5/0075 (EP,US);
H04W72/0453 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/04] | H04J11/00, H04B1/707, H04L1/00, H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/04] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM DRAHTLOSEN ÜBERTRAGUNG | [2016/26] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR WIRELESS TRANSMISSION | [2016/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION SANS FIL | [2016/26] |
Former [2011/04] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum drahtlosen Übertragung | ||
Former [2011/04] | Apparatus and method for wireless transmission | ||
Former [2011/04] | Dispositif et procédé de transmission sans fil | Examination procedure | 05.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 14.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 21.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02760694.6 / EP1422851 | EP10006626.5 / EP2234299 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020760694) is 17.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4627077 (ARMSTRONG THOMAS R [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 25 - column 1, line 39 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 4 * * column 2, line 43 - column 2, line 48 * * column 3, line 21 - line 23 *; | [Y]US4924516 (BREMER GORDON [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 1, line 54 - column 1, line 68 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 21 *; | [A]JP2001189769 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [Y] - FU P-W ET AL, "A PROGRAMMABLE TRANSCEIVER STRUCTURE OF MULTI-RATE OFDM-CDMA FOR WIRELESS MULTIMEDIA COMMUNICATIONS", VTC 2001 SPRING. IEEE VTS 53RD. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. RHODES, GREECE, MAY 6 - 9, 2001; [IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20010506), vol. CONF. 53, ISBN 978-0-7803-6728-9, pages 1942 - 1946, XP001082482 [Y] 1-8 * Section 3, "Programmable OFDM-CDMA transmitter" Section 4, last two paragraphs * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2001.945034 | Examination | EP0938208 | by applicant | JP2001257027 | JP2002231976 |