EP2436711 - Biocomposite board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RESOPAL GMBH Hans-Böckler-Strasse 4 64823 Gross-Umstadt / DE | [2012/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaefer, Donald Buckhausstrasse 31 91522 Ansbach / DE | 02 /
Reitzel, Lutz Memelstrasse 14 64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Mai Besier European Trademark Attorneys Patentanwälte Kreuzberger Ring 18a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Mai, Dörr, Besier Patentanwälte Steuerberater/Wirtschaftsprüfer John-F.-Kennedy-Straße 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 10012677.0 | 01.10.2010 | [2012/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2436711 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08G16/02, C08L61/26, D21F1/00 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
C08G16/0262 (EP,US);
B32B5/28 (US);
C08L61/26 (EP,US);
C08L97/02 (EP,US);
D21J1/16 (EP,US);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31946 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L97/02, C08L99/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Biokompositplatte | [2012/14] | English: | Biocomposite board | [2012/14] | French: | Plaque biocomposite | [2012/14] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/14] | 13.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2404840 (HARVEY MORTIMER T) [A] 1-15* column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 59; example -; claims 1-2 *; | [A]GB629408 (QUAKER OATS CO) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 12 - page 3, line 33; example -; claims 1-20 *; | [A]US2601497 (BROWN LLOYD H) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 17; example -; claim 1 *; | [A]US3455860 (VALENTINE EDWARD S) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 10 - column 3, line 25; example -; claims 1-12 * | by applicant | - Römpp-Lexikon Chemie | - STICHWORT, Furan-Harze |