EP2306329 - Multi-user computer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raritan Computer, Inc. 400 Cottontail Lane Somerset, New Jersey 08873 / US | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bates, Philip 11 Chestnut Avenue York North Yorks. YO31 0BR / GB | 02 /
Anderson, John Richard 31 Acorn Grove Chandlers Ford Hants SO53 4LA / GB | 03 /
McDermott, John Aloysius Pyrford Cottage West Byfleet Hants GU22 8PH / GB | [2011/14] | Representative(s) | Gray, Helen Mary, et al ZACCO GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [2011/14] | Application number, filing date | 10012877.6 | 28.10.1998 | [2011/14] | Priority number, date | US19970063695P | 28.10.1997 Original published format: US 63695 P | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2306329 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2306329 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40, G06F9/44, H04L12/44 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
G06F13/4022 (EP,US);
G06F9/453 (EP,US);
H04L49/351 (EP,US);
H04L49/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/14] | Title | German: | Computersystem für mehrere Benutzer | [2011/14] | English: | Multi-user computer system | [2011/14] | French: | Système informatique multiutilisateurs | [2011/14] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 16.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06007885.4 / EP1674994 | EP98951566.3 / EP1025490 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980951566) is 06.09.2000 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.2013 | BE | 02.01.2013 | CY | 02.01.2013 | DK | 02.01.2013 | FI | 02.01.2013 | IT | 02.01.2013 | NL | 02.01.2013 | SE | 02.01.2013 | GR | 03.04.2013 | ES | 13.04.2013 | PT | 02.05.2013 | [2014/03] |
Former [2013/52] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 02.01.2013 | |
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 02.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0430673 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US5287461 (MOORE GREGORY J [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US5357420 (GOHI TETSUJI [JP]) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [AD]WO9708625 (APEX PC SOLUTIONS INC [US]) [AD] 1-19; | US5721842 [ ] (BEASLEY DANNY L [US], et al) [ ] * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * figure 12A * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 47 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 10 * * column 10, line 61 - column 12, line 64 * | by applicant | US5721842 |