|
20.04.2016 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2015 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.01.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
14.01.2015 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.05.2011 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.03.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
02.03.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
02.03.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
02.03.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
02.03.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
39 |