13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
22.04.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
01.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
25.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
13.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
04.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
22.05.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
09.05.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
10.04.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.04.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.04.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
29.01.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.09.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.03.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.11.2013 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
30.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
26.03.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.01.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.09.2012 |
First examination report |
|
11.09.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.01.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] |
05.01.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.09.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.09.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
29.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
22.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|