EP2309356 - System and methodology providing audit recording and tracking in real time industrial controller environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive, 10 Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2013/30] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states Rockwell Software Inc. 1201 South 2nd Street Milwaukee Wisconsin 53204-2496 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamilton, Jeffrey L. 10634 Crestview Drive Cedarburg, WI 53012 / US | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/47] |
Former [2011/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10012934.5 | 28.08.2003 | [2011/15] | Priority number, date | US20020299496 | 19.11.2002 Original published format: US 299496 | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2309356 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2309356 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | [2011/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2309356 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/4063, G06F11/34, G06F1/00, G06F11/32, H04L9/00 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
G05B19/4063 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25205 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35291 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36542 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2101 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99953 (US);
Y10S707/99954 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/47] |
Former [2011/15] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Kontrollaufzeichnung und Verfolgung einer Betriebsreglerumgebung in Realzeit | [2011/15] | English: | System and methodology providing audit recording and tracking in real time industrial controller environment | [2011/15] | French: | Système et méthodologie permettant d'élaborer une fiche de contrôle et un suivi en temps réel d'un environnement industriel contrôleur | [2011/15] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 07.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03019418.7 / EP1422585 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030019418) is 28.03.2006 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4251858 (CAMBIGUE ARTHUR E, et al) [X] 1,14,16,17,19* the whole document *; | [X]US5469352 (YUKUTOMO MASASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0740241 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X]US5805442 (CRATER KENNETH C [US], et al) [X] 19-21 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2352058 (HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS IND [KR]) [X] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1180872 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SA [FR]) [Y] 19-21 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2814260 (AVENSY INGENIERIE [FR]) [Y] 19-21 * the whole document * |