EP2275029 - Lesion identification marker for surgical operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/03] | Lesion identification marker for surgical operation and related method | ||
[2014/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2011/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaji, Kunihide c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 02 /
Hatta, Shinji c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Keita c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2, Htagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 04 /
Morizane, Yuichi 3-6-19-502, Sanda-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193-0832 / JP | 05 /
Takara, Toshiyuki 5-16-7-401, Shikatebukuro Minami-ku Saitama-shi Saitama-ken 336-0031 / JP | 06 /
Saito, Tatsuya 5-31-2, Funabashi Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156-0055 / JP | 07 /
Takigawa, Takeshi c/o Olympus corporation 43-2,Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/11] | 01 /
Kaji, Kunihide 1-39-2-2-405 Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0023 / JP | ||
02 /
Hatta, Shinji 1159-1-412, Uchikoshi-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0911 / JP | |||
03 /
Suzuki, Keita 1-26-2-401, Nishi-machi Kokubunji-shi Tokyo 185-0035 / JP | |||
04 /
Morizane, Yuichi 3-6-19-502, Sanda-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193-0832 / JP | |||
05 /
Takara, Toshiyuki 5-16-7-401, Shikatebukuro Minami-ku Saitama-shi Saitama-ken 336-0031 / JP | |||
06 /
Saito, Tatsuya 5-31-2, Funabashi Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156-0055 / JP | |||
07 /
Takigawa, Takeshi c/o Olympus corporation 43-2,Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
Former [2011/03] | 01 /
Kaji, Kunihide 1-39-2-2-405 Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0023 / JP | ||
02 /
Hatta, Shinji 1159-1-412, Uchikoshi-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0911 / JP | |||
03 /
Suzuki, Keita 1-26-2-401, Nishi-machi Kokubunji-shi Tokyo 185-0035 / JP | |||
04 /
Morizane, Yuichi 3-6-19-502, Sanda-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193-0832 / JP | |||
05 /
Takara, Toshiyuki 5-16-7-401, Shikatebukuro Minami-ku Saitama-shi Saitama-ken 336-0031 / JP | |||
06 /
Saito, Tatsuya 5-31-2, Funabashi Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156-0055 / JP | |||
07 /
Takigawa, Takeshi 1-19-1-204, Minamidaira Hino-shi Tokyo 191-0041 / JP | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/03] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10013003.8 | 04.02.2005 | [2011/03] | Priority number, date | JP20040030509 | 06.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004030509 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2275029 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2275029 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2275029 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/06, A61B1/06, A61B19/00 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61B5/06 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3908 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3933 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3941 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3945 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/21] |
Former [2011/03] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Gerät zur Identifikation von Läsionen bei chirurgischen Eingriffen | [2014/48] | English: | Lesion identification marker for surgical operation | [2014/48] | French: | Dispositif d'identification de lésions utilisés dans l'exécution d'opérations chirurgicales | [2014/48] |
Former [2011/03] | Gerät und Verfahren zur Identifikation von Läsionen bei chirurgischen Eingriffen | ||
Former [2011/03] | Lesion identification marker for surgical operation and related method | ||
Former [2011/03] | Dispositif et procédé d'identification de lésions utilisés dans l'exécution d'opérations chirurgicales | Examination procedure | 01.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 09.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.10.2014 | 22.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05002421.5 / EP1561420 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050002421) is 02.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 04.02.2016 | [2017/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6293911 (IMAIZUMI KATSUICHI [JP], et al); | [XA]US6424857 (HENRICHS PAUL MARK [US], et al); | [XA]US2003060718 (ALAM ABU [US], et al); | [XA]US6589998 (BIANCHI ANNETTE [US], et al) | Examination | US5577991 | US2003013937 | US2003135091 | by applicant | JPH0378 | JPH0327808 | JP2794162B | JP2004030509 |