Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
13.10.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.09.2017 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
19.05.2017 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
06.02.2017 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
27.01.2017 | First examination report | |
14.10.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.10.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.10.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.10.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.11.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
31.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.10.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.04.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |