Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9668944 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2017 | B2 | US2015231040 | 20.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514704301 | 05.05.2015 | EP10013769 | 19.10.2010 | WO2011EP05233 | 18.10.2011 | US201313979815 | 22.10.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014039088 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10013769 | 19.10.2010 | WO2011EP05233 | 18.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5898218B | Global Dossier | 06.04.2016 | B2 | JP2013540137 | 31.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10013769 | 19.10.2010 | WO2011EP05233 | 18.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2629741 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2022 | B1 | EP2629741 | 28.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11773194 | 18.10.2011 | EP10013769 | 19.10.2010 | WO2011EP05233 | 18.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103153264B | Global Dossier | 09.09.2015 | B | CN103153264 | 12.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10013769 | 19.10.2010 | WO2011EP05233 | 18.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2814751 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2018 | C | CA2814751 | 26.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10013769 | 19.10.2010 | WO2011EP05233 | 18.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1185815 | 28.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10013769 | 19.10.2010 | WO2011EP05233 | 18.10.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012052161 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10013769 | 19.10.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2444052 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10013769 | 19.10.2010 |