EP2444052 - Dental composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dentsply DeTrey GmbH De-Trey-Strasse 1 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stelzig, Simon Am Fliesshorn 4 78465 Konstanz / DE | 02 /
Klee, Joachim, E. Espelweg 3/4 78315 Radolfzell / DE | 03 /
Facher, Andreas Hofackerstr. 4 8543 Gundetswil / CH | 04 /
Weber, Christoph Händelstr. 1 78464 Konstanz / DE | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10013769.4 | 19.10.2010 | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2444052 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/02, A61K6/083, C07C233/09, C07C233/31 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
C07C231/02 (EP,US);
A61K6/77 (EP,US);
A61K6/30 (EP,US);
A61K6/884 (EP,US);
A61K6/887 (EP,US);
A61K6/889 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K6/30, C08L33/00 (EP,US);
A61K6/30, C08L33/10 (EP,US);
A61K6/30, C08L75/16 (EP,US);
A61K6/889, C08L33/00 (US,EP);
A61K6/889, C08L33/10 (US,EP);
A61K6/893, C08L75/16 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dentale Zusammensetzung | [2012/17] | English: | Dental composition | [2012/17] | French: | Composition dentaire | [2012/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 26.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/02] | 01.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0318162 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]) [X] 14 * page 4, line 49 - page 5, line 4 * * claims 1,2 *; | [X]WO9221632 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,2,6,8-13 * page 1, line 5 - line 17 * * page 3, line 17 - line 22 * * page 12, line 3 - page 13, line 2; example 1 * * page 20, line 30 - page 21, line 4 * * page 21, line 21 - page 24, line 6 *; | [I]WO9527008 (HENKEL CORP [US]) [I] 4 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 23 * * page 9; example 6 * * claim 5 11 *; | [I]WO03035013 (DENTSPLY DETREY GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-14 * page 5, paragraph l * * page 13, line 1 - page 16, line l * * page 22, paragraph l * * page 32; example 6 * * page 34; example 1 * * claims 1-6 11-35,38-41 * * page 2, line 1 - line 15 *; | [X]US2003232944 (MOLENBERG AALDERT RENS [NL], et al) [X] 14 * page 19, paragraph [0219] - paragraph [0220] *; | [X]WO2008121895 (MEDIVAS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,10-13 * page 2, paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * page 4, paragraph [0019] * * page 5, paragraph [0021] * * page 19, paragraph [0068] * * page 49, paragraph [0176] * * page 51, paragraph [0181] - paragraph [0183] * * page 62; table 6; compounds 13-15 * * claims 1,2 *; | [X] - Galanti, Anthony V. et al., "The synthesis of bisitaconamic acids and isomeric bisimide monomers", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1982), Database accession no. 1982:86009, XP002630521 [X] 14 * abstract * | [X] - Kataoka, Toshiya, "N,N'-ethylenedimaleamic acid", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1969), Database accession no. 1972:112715, XP002630617 [X] 14 * abstract * | [X] - Krishnan, K.; Vijayan, T. M.; Ninan, K. N., "Cure optimization studies of polyamino bis-itaconimide polymer by TMA and TG", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1991), Database accession no. 1993:604476, XP002630618 [X] 14 * abstract * | [I] - MOSZNER, NORBERT ET AL., "Monomers for adhesive polymers, 4 synthesis and radical polymerization of hydrolytically stable crosslinking monomers", MACROMOLECULAR MATERIALS AND ENGINEERING, (2003), vol. 288, no. 8, pages 621 - 628, XP008134688 [I] 1-14 * page 621 - page 622, column left; compound 1I * * page 624, column right; compound 1L * * Result and discussion; page 626 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mame.200350003 | [I] - JOACHIM E. KLEE ET AL., "N-alkyl-N-(phosphonoethyl) substituted (meth)acrylamides - new adhesive monomers for self-etching self-priming one part dental adhesive", BEILSTEIN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 5, no. 72, pages 1 - 9, XP008134689 [I] 1-14 * page 1 - page 2 * * page 3; table 1; compounds 3g,3h,3i,3j * * page 5, column left, paragraph 3 * * page 6 - page 7; compounds 3g,3h,3i,3j * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3762/bjoc.5.72 | [I] - PAVLINEC, JURAJ; MOSZNER, NORBERT, "Monomers for adhesive polymers, 8a crosslinking polymerization of selected N-substituted bis(acrylamide)s for dental filling materials", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 113, pages 3137 - 3145, XP008134674 [I] 1-14 * introduction; page 3137 * * Experimental; page 3138; compound I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.30188 | by applicant | US3655605 | US3814717 | US4016124 | US4035321 | US4089830 | US4143018 | US4209434 | US4317681 | US4342677 | US4360605 | US4374936 | US4376835 | US5130347 | US5154762 | WO02092021 | JP2005065902 | US6953832 | JP2006512466 |