EP2289673 - Portable, automated cup-fixing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juston, Robert 72, Avenue de Saxe 69003 Lyon / FR | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Martin Peter IXAS Conseil 22 avenue René Cassin 69009 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Schmidt, Martin Peter IXAS Conseil 15, rue Emile Zola 69002 Lyon / FR | ||
Former [2011/09] | Schmidt, Martin Peter IXAS Conseil 15, rue Emile Zola 69002 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 10014292.6 | 09.11.2009 | [2011/09] | Priority number, date | FR20080006534 | 21.11.2008 Original published format: FR 0806534 | [2011/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2289673 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2289673 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B26B25/00, B23D21/08, B26D3/16, B25B7/22 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
B23D45/16 (EP);
A01G3/08 (EP);
B26D3/169 (EP);
B26D1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | Automatisiertes, tragbares System zum Befestigen und Abschneiden | [2011/09] | English: | Portable, automated cup-fixing system | [2011/09] | French: | Système fixe-coupe, portable, automatisé | [2011/09] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 08.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09356057.1 / EP2189258 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.01.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2009 | AT | 29.02.2012 | CY | 29.02.2012 | CZ | 29.02.2012 | DK | 29.02.2012 | EE | 29.02.2012 | FI | 29.02.2012 | HR | 29.02.2012 | IE | 29.02.2012 | IT | 29.02.2012 | LT | 29.02.2012 | LV | 29.02.2012 | MK | 29.02.2012 | MT | 29.02.2012 | NL | 29.02.2012 | PL | 29.02.2012 | RO | 29.02.2012 | SE | 29.02.2012 | SI | 29.02.2012 | SK | 29.02.2012 | SM | 29.02.2012 | TR | 29.02.2012 | BG | 29.05.2012 | NO | 29.05.2012 | GR | 30.05.2012 | ES | 09.06.2012 | IS | 29.06.2012 | PT | 29.06.2012 | LU | 09.11.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 09.11.2009 | |
AT | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
SM | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
LU | 09.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
SM | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
LU | 09.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 29.02.2012 | |
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4176450 (MUROMOTO WASABURO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4177557 (COURTY AURELE [CA]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 21 - column 2, line 18; figures 1,2,6-8 *; | [A]GB2333486 (ELIZA TINSLEY GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [AD]WO2005008078 (WICKLUND JAMES VANERD JR [US]) [AD] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2005008078 |