Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2320097 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2320097



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 67
04.01.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
16.05.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.04.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
04.03.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.03.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 1
04.03.2011 European search report Search / examination 2
01.12.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
01.12.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
01.12.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
12.11.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
12.11.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
10.11.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
10.11.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
06.11.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.11.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
06.11.2010 Description Search / examination 6
06.11.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.11.2010 Drawings Search / examination 4
06.11.2010 Previously filed application Search / examination 14
06.11.2010 Priority document Search / examination 14
06.11.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 9