blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2320097

EP2320097 - Cage nut [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.05.2012
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.06.2012  [2012/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nedschroef Plettenberg GmbH
Mühlhoff 5d
58840 Plettenberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/19]For all designated states
NEDSCHROEF PLETTENBERG GmbH
Mühlhoff 5d
58840 Plettenberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ferreau, Oliver
Knappenstr. 17
44799 Bochum / DE
02 / Teper, Emrullah
Am Schmechtingsbach 17
44388 Dortmund / DE
03 / Peil, Andreas
Wilhelm Rademacher Str. 5
58640 Iserlohn / DE
04 / Calitri, Canio
Lampferweg 3
58762 Altena / DE
 [2011/19]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Dörner & Kötter PartG mbB
Körnerstrasse 27
58095 Hagen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/19]Dörner, Kötter & Kollegen
Körnerstrasse 27
58095 Hagen / DE
Application number, filing date10014357.706.11.2010
[2011/19]
Priority number, dateDE2009105241510.11.2009         Original published format: DE102009052415
[2011/19]
Previously filed application, dateDE2009105241510.11.2009
[2011/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2320097
Date:11.05.2011
Language:DE
[2011/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2011
ClassificationIPC:F16B37/04
[2011/19]
CPC:
F16B37/044 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Käfigmutter[2011/19]
English:Cage nut[2011/19]
French:Ecrou de cage[2011/19]
Examination procedure12.11.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/23]
04.01.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2012/23]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE20316765U  (KEMMERICH JOSEF [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,6-8;
 [A]DE9409977U  (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.