EP2452829 - Method for applying a decoration to a wooden material board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/20] | Method for attaching a finish to a wooden material board | ||
[2017/24] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flooring Technologies Ltd. Portico Building Marina Street Pieta PTA 9044 / MT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | For all designated states Flooring Technologies Ltd. Portico Building Marina Street Pieta PTA 9044 / MT | ||
Former [2012/20] | For all designated states Flooring Technologies Ltd. Portico Building Marina Street Pieta PTA 9044 / MT | ||
For all designated states Falquon GmbH Am Hünengrab 18 16928 Pritzwalk / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalwa, Norbert, Dr. Birkenweg 18a 32805 Horn-Bad Meinberg / DE | [2013/33] |
Former [2012/20] | 01 /
* * * | Representative(s) | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | ||
Former [2012/20] | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 10014439.3 | 10.11.2010 | [2012/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2452829 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2452829 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2452829 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B44F9/02, B44C5/04 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
B41M3/008 (EP,US);
B41M1/10 (EP,CN,US);
B32B38/145 (US);
B05D7/06 (US);
B32B37/10 (CN);
B41M1/38 (EP,US);
B41M3/06 (CN);
B41M5/0047 (EP,US);
B41M5/0076 (EP,CN,US);
B44F9/02 (CN);
B32B37/02 (US);
B32B38/10 (US);
|
Former IPC [2012/20] | B44F9/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufbringen eines Dekors auf eine Holzwerkstoffplatte | [2012/20] | English: | Method for applying a decoration to a wooden material board | [2017/24] | French: | Procédé d'application d'un décor sur une plaque de matière dérivée du bois | [2012/20] |
Former [2012/20] | Method for attaching a finish to a wooden material board | Examination procedure | 04.06.2011 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 05.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13002615.6 / EP2628610 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.2014
05.10.2016
WITHDRAWN Fritz Egger GmbH & Co. OG Tiroler Strasse 16 3105 Unterradlberg / AT Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/45] |
Former [2015/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.2014
01.04.2014
ADMISSIBLE Fritz Egger GmbH & Co. OG Tiroler Strasse 16 3105 Unterradlberg / AT Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2014/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.2014
01.04.2014
ADMISSIBLE Fritz Egger GmbH & Co. OG Tiroler Strasse 16 3105 Unterradlberg / AT Opponent's representative Meyer, Hans-Joachim COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | 07.05.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.09.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.09.2014 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2014 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 03.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 11.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 02.12.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.01.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.01.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.05.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.11.2010 | AL | 26.06.2013 | CY | 26.06.2013 | CZ | 26.06.2013 | DK | 26.06.2013 | EE | 26.06.2013 | FI | 26.06.2013 | GR | 26.06.2013 | HR | 26.06.2013 | LT | 26.06.2013 | LV | 26.06.2013 | MC | 26.06.2013 | MK | 26.06.2013 | MT | 26.06.2013 | RO | 26.06.2013 | RS | 26.06.2013 | SI | 26.06.2013 | SM | 26.06.2013 | BG | 26.09.2013 | NO | 26.09.2013 | IS | 26.10.2013 | IE | 10.11.2013 | [2019/29] |
Former [2018/46] | HU | 10.11.2010 | |
AL | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
GR | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MK | 26.06.2013 | ||
MT | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
IE | 10.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/03] | HU | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
GR | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MK | 26.06.2013 | ||
MT | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
IE | 10.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/41] | HU | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
GR | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MK | 26.06.2013 | ||
MT | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
IE | 10.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HU | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
GR | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MK | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
IE | 10.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MK | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
IE | 10.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MK | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
IE | 10.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
IE | 10.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
IE | 10.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 26.06.2013 | |
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 26.06.2013 | |
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 26.06.2013 | |
NO | 26.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1762400 (FLOORING TECHNOLOGIES LTD [MT]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] *; | [A]US2007196624 (CHEN HAO A [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0066] *; | [A]EP1839884 (BUERKLE GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0004] *; | [A]EP2098380 (FLOORING TECHNOLOGIES LTD [MT]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] * | by applicant | EP1918095 | DE102007012236 | Opposition | EP1454763 | US2005249924 | WO2009087440 | WO2011110373 |