EP2322439 - Tool transport box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Germans Boada, S.A. Pol. Ind. Can Roses Avda. Olimpiades, s/n 08191 Rubi (Barcelona) / ES | [2011/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Torrents i Comas, Josep Pol.IndCan Roses Avda. Olimpiades, s/n 08191 Rubi (Barcelona) / ES | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Maldonado Jordan, Julia Linares, 7 - 3 46018 Valencia / ES | [2011/20] | Application number, filing date | 10014547.3 | 12.11.2010 | [2011/20] | Priority number, date | ES20090030657U | 17.11.2009 Original published format: ES 200930657 U | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2322439 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65D6/10, A45C15/00, B25H3/02, // A45C13/36 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
A45C15/00 (EP);
B25H3/023 (EP);
A45C13/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Werkzeugtransportkasten | [2011/20] | English: | Tool transport box | [2011/20] | French: | Boîtier de transport d'outils | [2011/20] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 30.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8105612U (ELBOTAINER KUNSTSTOFF- UND VERPACKUNGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US5979175 (ELLISON PETER L [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 34 - column 4, line 6 *; | [X]EP1685929 (HITACHI KOKI KK [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0090] * |